EP2388278 - MODIFIED SUGAR BEET PECTIN AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states San-Ei Gen F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 561-8588 / JP | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAUMA, Makoto c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | 02 /
ISHIHARA, Sayaka c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | 03 /
FUNAMI, Takahiro c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I., INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | [2019/32] |
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
NAKAUMA, Makoto c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIHARA, Sayaka c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
FUNAMI, Takahiro c/o SAN-EI GEN F.F.I. INC. 1-1-11, Sanwa-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/32] |
Former [2011/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10731239.9 | 12.01.2010 | [2019/32] | WO2010JP50243 | Priority number, date | JP20090004754 | 13.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009004754 | [2011/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010082570 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388278 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388278 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/06, B01F17/36 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
C08B37/0045 (EP,US);
C08L5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | C08B37/06, A23L1/035, A23L1/05, B01F17/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES ZUCKERRÜBENPEKTIN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2011/47] | English: | MODIFIED SUGAR BEET PECTIN AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME | [2011/47] | French: | PECTINE DE BETTERAVE SUCRIÈRE AMÉLIORÉE ET SON UTILISATION | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2011 | Translation filed | 11.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 07.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 06.07.2015 | Appeal received No. T2135/15 | 04.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.04.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2010 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | IE | 12.01.2020 | LU | 12.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.01.2010 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 07.08.2019 | |
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5008254 (WEIBEL MICHAEL K [US]) [X] 1-15 * example 3 * | [X] - P. A. WILLIAMS ET AL, "Elucidation of the Emulsification Properties of Sugar Beet Pectin", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20050501), vol. 53, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jf0404142, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 3592 - 3597, XP055053691 [X] 1-15 * page 3593; figure 4; tables 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf0404142 | International search | [X]JP2006274226 (NAT FOOD RES, et al); | [X]JP2006274227 (NAT FOOD RES, et al); | [A]JPH03197502 (SBP INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2007066233 (DANISCO SUGAR AS [DK], et al) | Examination | JP2006274226 | by applicant | JPS5896010 | JP2000139344 | JP2005525808 | JP2005261430 | WO2006132288 | WO2007037347 | JP2006274226 | JP2006274227 | JP2004536624 | - IDRIS, O.H.M., WILLIAMS, P.A., PHILLIPS, G.O., FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (1998), vol. 12, pages 375 - 388 | - "Studies on the Oil-in-Water Emulsions Stabilized with Gum Arabic by Using the Turbidity Ratio Method", JOURNAL OF THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1992), vol. 112, no. 12, pages 906 - 913 |