EP2374516 - METHOD FOR EXTRACTING MATERIALS AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zakrytoe Akcionernoe Obschestvo "Twin Trading Company" Mosfilmovskaya street, 17/25 Moscow 119330 / RU | [2014/20] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Zakpytoe Akcionernoe Obschestvo "Twin Trading Company" Mosfilmovskaya street, 17/25 Moscow 119330 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAMOV, Yakov Kuzmich Orehovo-Zuevsky Proezd 10-68 Moscow 109202 / RU | 02 /
VESELOV, Vladimir Mihailovich ul. Marshala Katukova 9/1-137 Moscow 123181 / RU | 03 /
ZALEVSKY, Viktor Mihailovich h vsk r. 18/1-78 Moscow 125080 / RU | 04 /
TAMURK, Vitaly Grigorevich ul. N v r ssiis y 12-16 Moscow 109386 / RU | 05 /
VOLODIN, Veniamin Sergeevich ul. Shkolnaya 53-4 Vidnoe Moskovskaya obl. 142700 / RU | 06 /
VESELOVA, Natalja Vladimirovna ul. Lesnaja 10-63 Dzerzhinsky Moskovskaya obl. 140093 / RU | 07 /
ERMAKOVA, Larisa Sergeevna Michurinsky pr. 37-113 Moscow 119607 / RU | 08 /
KONDRASHKINA, Nina Semenovna ul. Novokocinskaja 47-52 Moscow 111672 / RU | 09 /
TALEEVA, Elena Vladimirovna ul. Liteinaya 9-10 Podolsk Moskovskaya obl. 142104 / RU | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/36] | Klemm, Rolf, et al Leo-Graetz-Straße 7 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/27] | Klemm, Rolf, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Post Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2011/41] | Klemm, Rolf Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10731436.1 | 26.02.2010 | WO2010RU00090 | Priority number, date | RU20080152177 | 29.12.2008 Original published format: RU 2008152177 | [2011/41] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010082870 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2374516 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2374516 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | [2012/38] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2374516 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2374516 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/02, B02C4/02 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
B01D11/0284 (EP,US);
A23L27/11 (EP,US);
A23L27/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
B01D11/0253 (EP,US);
B01D11/0261 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | B01D11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MATERIALEXTRAKTION UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG | [2011/41] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRACTING MATERIALS AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2011/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION DE MATIÈRES ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER CE PROCÉDÉ | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | Translation filed | 23.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2010 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3836337 (BRUNICHE OLSEN H) [A] 1,4 * column 3, lines 26-35; figure 1 *; | [A]GB462494 (JAQUES AUMARECHAL) [A] 1,4 * page 3, lines 35-52; figure - * | International search | [A]RU2163827 (ABRAMOV JAKOV KUZ MICH, et al); | [A]RU2213606 (GOLITSYN VLADIMIR PETROVICH, et al); | [A]RU2178708 (MIJA [RU], et al); | [A]SU856487 (LE LESOTEKH AKAD [SU]); | [A]GB912326 (GUNNAR KOELLE, et al); | [A]DE3228927 (EXTRAKTIONSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | SU1286232 | RU2213606 | RU2225242 | RU2163827 |