EP2432779 - BENZOXAZEPINES BASED P13K/MTOR INHIBITORS AGAINST PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/13] | BENZOXAZEPINES BASED P13K/MT0R INHIBITORS AGAINST PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES | ||
[2014/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exelixis, Inc. 210 East Grand Avenue P.O. Box 511 South San Francisco, CA 94083-0511 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAND, Neel, Kumar 977 El Camino Real Unit 303 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
BLAZEY, Charles, M. 171 Randall Street South San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
BOWLES, Owen, Joseph 1066 Manzanita Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 04 /
BUHR, Chris, Allen 355 Belmont Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 05 /
BUSSENIUS, Joerg 223 Bonita Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 06 /
CURTIS, Jeffry, Kimo 310 Redwood Road San Anselmo, CA 94960 / US | 07 /
DEFINA, Steven, Charles 1232 Floribunda Avenue 6 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 08 /
DUBENKO, Larisa 584 46th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | 09 /
HARRIS, Jason, R. 3130 College Drive San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | 10 /
JACKSON-UGUETO, Eileen 641 Stanford Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 11 /
JOSHI, Anagha 36340 Easterday Way Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 12 /
KIM, Angie, Inyoung 928 Shoal Drive San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | 13 /
TSUHAKO, Amy, Lew 1232 Madruga Way Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 14 /
MA, Sunghoon 802 Spruance Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 15 /
MANALO, Jean-claire, Limun 4159 Callan Boulevard Daly City, CA 94015 / US | 16 /
NG, Stephanie 267 Curtner Avenue 25 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 17 /
PETO, Csaba, J. 9 Christensen Court Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 18 /
RICE Kenneth D. 444 Montecillo Road San Rafael, CA 94903 / US | 19 /
TSANG, Tsze, H. 8367 Kent Drive El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | 20 /
ZAHARIA, Cristiana, A. 644 Topaz Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Main, Malcolm Charles Murgitroyd & Company Immeuble Atlantis 55 Allee Pierre Ziller 06560 Valbonne - Sophia Antipolis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Main, Malcolm Charles Murgitroyd & Company Immeuble Atlantis 55 Allee Pierre Ziller 06560 Valbonne - Sophia Antipolis / FR | Application number, filing date | 10731844.6 | 20.05.2010 | WO2010US35565 | Priority number, date | US20090216980P | 22.05.2009 Original published format: US 216980 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010135524 | Date: | 25.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2432779 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C07D487/04, C07D487/08, C07D495/04, C07D498/04, C07D513/04, C07D519/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/553 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/553 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D413/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | BA | 21.12.2011 | RS | 21.12.2011 | Title | German: | AUF BENZOXAZEPINEN BASIERENDE P13K/MT0R-HEMMER GEGEN PROLIFERATIVE ERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/13] | English: | BENZOXAZEPINES BASED P13K/MTOR INHIBITORS AGAINST PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES | [2014/13] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PI3K/MTOR À BASE DE BENZOXAZÉPINES POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES MALADIES PROLIFÉRATIVES | [2012/13] |
Former [2012/13] | BENZOXAZEPINES BASED P13K/MT0R INHIBITORS AGAINST PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 21.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004078733 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 258; compound 656 * * page 296; compound 807 * * Use in therapy of pain and cancer pain:; page 544; claim 212 *; | [A]WO2008108445 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 178; examples 28,33 *; | [A]WO2008109599 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * pages 20,52,54; tables 3a,4; compounds Ia-20 * * Use in therapy of cancer:;; claims 16-17 *; | [A]WO2009042092 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 47; example 151 ** Use in therapy of cancer:; page 1626 - line 33 *; | [AP]EP2123644 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [AP] 1-31 * page 58; examples 28,33 * * Use in therapy of cancer:; page 38, line 18 - line 27 * | by applicant | - CAMPBELL ET AL., CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, pages 7678 - 7681 | - LEVINE ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 11, pages 2875 - 2878 | - WANG ET AL., HUM MUTAT, (2005), vol. 25, page 322 | - LEE ET AL., GYNECOL ONCOL, (2005), vol. 97, pages 26 - 34 | - BACHMAN ET AL., CANCER BIOL THER, (2004), vol. 3, pages 772 - 775 | - LI ET AL., BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (2006), vol. 96, pages 91 - 95 | - SAAL ET AL., CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, pages 2554 - 2559 | - SAMUELS; VELCULESCU, CELL CYCLE, (2004), vol. 3, pages 1221 - 1224 | - SAMUELS, SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, page 554 | - VCLHO ET AL., EUR J CANCER, (2005), vol. 41, pages 1649 - 1654 | - ODA ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 10669 - 10673 | - BYUN ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2003), vol. 104, pages 318 - 327 | - LEE ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, pages 1477 - 1480 | - TANG ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2006), vol. 51, pages 181 - 191 | - MASSION ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2004), vol. 170, pages 1088 - 1094 | - WU ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2005), vol. 90, pages 4688 - 4693 | - SUJOBERT ET AL., BLOOD, (1997), vol. 106, pages 1063 - 1066 | - HICKEY; COTTER, J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, pages 2441 - 2450 | - HARTMANN ET AL., ACTA NEUROPATHOL (BERL), (2005), vol. 109, pages 639 - 642 | - BJORNSTI; HOUGHTON, REV CANCER, (2004), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 335 - 48 | - HOUGHTON; HUANG, MICROBIOL IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 279, pages 339 - 59 | - INOKI; CORRADETTI ET AL., NAT GENET, (2005), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 19 - 24 | - NAGATA, LAN ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 117 - 27 | - PANDOLFI, NENGL J MED, (2004), vol. 351, no. 22, pages 2337 - 8 | - NAHTA, YU ET AL., NAT CLIN PRACT ONCOL, (2006), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 269 - 280 | - DAL COL, ZANCAI ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, no. 10, pages 5142 - 51 | - THOMAS, TRAN ET AL., NAT MED, (2006), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 122 - 7 | - ATKINS, HIDALGO ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2004), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 909 - 18 | - MOTZER, HUDES ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2007), vol. 25, no. 25, pages 3958 - 64 | - SUJOBCRT, BARDCT ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 1063 - 6 | - BILLOTTET, GRANDAGE ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2006), vol. 25, no. 50, pages 6648 - 6659 | - TAMBURINI, ELIE ET AL., BLOOD, (2007), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 1025 - 8 | - SKORSKI, BELLACOSA ET AL., EMBO J, (1997), vol. 16, no. 20, pages 6151 - 61 | - BAI, OUYANG ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, no. 13, pages 4319 - 27 | - HICKEY; COTTER, BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, no. 5, pages 2441 - 50 | - UDDIN, HUSSAIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 13, pages 4178 - 86 | - HERNANDO, CHARYTONOWICZ ET AL., NAT MED, (2007), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 748 - 53 | - WAN; HELMAN, ONCOLOGIST, (2007), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 1007 - 18 | - CAO, YU ET AL., CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 68, no. 19, pages 8039 - 8048 | - WAN, SHEN ET AL., NEOPLASIA, (2006), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 394 - 401 | - SHAYESTEH, LU ET AL., NAT GENET, (1999), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 99 - 102 | - LEE, CHOI ET AL., GYNECOL ONCOL, (2005), vol. 97, no. 1, pages 26 - 34 | - OBATA, MORLAND ET AL., CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, no. 10, pages 2095 - 7 | - LU, WU ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 2543 - 50 | - TANG, HE ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (2006), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 181 - 91 | - MARSIT, ZHENG ET AL., HUM PATHOL, (2005), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 768 - 76 | - MASSION, TAFLAN ET AL., AM J RE.SPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2004), vol. 170, no. 10, pages 1088 - 94 | - KOKUBO, GEMMA ET AL., BR J CANCER, (2005), vol. 92, no. 9, pages 1711 - 9 | - PAO, WANG ET AL., PUB LIBRARY OF SCIENCE MED, (2005), vol. 2, no. 1, page E17 | - VELHO, OLIVEIRA ET AL., EUR J CANCER, (2005), vol. 41, no. 11, pages 1649 - 54 | - FOUKAS, CLARET ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, no. 7091, pages 366 - 370 | - GOCL, ARNOLD, CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, no. 9, pages 3014 - 21 | - NASSIF, LOBO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 617 - 28 | - BOS CANCER RES, (1989), vol. 49, no. 17, pages 4682 - 9 | - FEARON, ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (1995), vol. 768, pages 101 - 10 | - BYUN, CHO ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2003), vol. 104, no. 3, pages 318 - 27 | - LEE, SOUNG ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1477 - 80 | - HU, HUANG ET AL., CANCER, (2003), vol. 97, no. 8, pages 1929 - 40 | - WAN, JIANG ET AL., CANCER RES CLIN ONCOL, (2003), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 100 - 6 | - GULDBERG; STRATEN ET AL., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, no. 17, pages 3660 - 3 | - TSAO, ZHANG ET AL., CANCER RES, (2000), vol. 60, no. 7, pages 1800 - 4 | - WHITEMAN, ZHOU ET AL., INT J CANCER, (2002), vol. 99, no. 1, pages 63 - 7 | - GOEL, LAZAR ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL, (2006), vol. 126, no. L, pages 154 - 60 | - ASANO, YAO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, no. 53, pages 8571 - 80 | - CAIRNS, OKAMI ET AL., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, no. 22, pages 4997 - 5000 | - GRAY, STEWART ET AL., BR J CANCER, (1998), vol. 78, no. 10, pages 1296 - 300 | - WANG, PARSONS ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 811 - 5 | - WHANG, WU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, no. 9, pages 5246 - 50 | - MAJUMDER; SELLERS, ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, no. 50, pages 7465 - 74 | - WANG, GARCIA ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 5, pages 1480 - 5 | - LU, REN ET AL., INTJ ONCOL, (2006), vol. 28, no. L, pages 245 - 51 | - MULHOLLAND, DEDHAR ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2006), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 329 - 37 | - XIN, TEITELL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, vol. 03, no. 20, pages 7789 - 94 | - MIKHAILOVA, WANG ET AL., ADV EXP MED BIOL, (2008), vol. 617, pages 397 - 405 | - WANG, MIKHAILOVA, ONCOGENE, (2008), vol. 27, no. 56, pages 7106 - 7117 | - GARCIA-ROSTAN, COSTA ET AL., CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, no. 22, pages 10199 - 207 | - WU, MAMBO ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2005), vol. 90, no. 8, pages 4688 - 93 | - BISSLER, MCCORMACK ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (2008), vol. 358, no. 2, pages 140 - 151 | - RANDA M. S, AMIN PATHOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (2008), vol. 58, no. 1, pages 38 - 44 | - GUPTA, MCKENNA ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 885 - 892 | - FERNER, EUR JHUM GENET, (2006), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 131 - 138 | - SABATINI, NAT REV CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 729 - 734 | - JOHANNESSEN, JOHNSON ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 56 - 62 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - J. OF MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, no. 12, pages 3163 - 3179 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 2784 - 2788 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, no. 14, pages 2703 - 10 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1983), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 420 - 5 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS, (1987), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 1485 - 8 | - HETEROCYCLES, (1999), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 867 - 874 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, no. 21, pages 6199 - 205 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, pages 1177 - 1186 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, pages 2902 - 2913 | - ORG. LCTT., (2003), vol. 5, pages 97 - 99 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, pages 1515 - 1521 | - TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1997), vol. 8, pages 1253 - 1257 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1974), vol. 96, pages 2121 - 2129 | - J. BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2007), pages 1106 - 1116 | - BIOORG. AND MED. CHEM. LETT., (2003), vol. 13, pages 2485 - 2488 | - MONATSHEFTE FUER CHEMIE, (1983), vol. 114, no. 6-7, pages 789 - 98 | - SYNTHESIS, (2003), vol. 11, pages 1649 - 1652 | - ELARIDI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2005), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 1309 - 1319 | - CAN. J. CHEM., (1981), vol. 59, pages 601 - 608 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 721 - 739 | - J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM., (2003), vol. 40, page 261 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 38, pages 7337 - 7340 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, no. 19, pages 5406 - 5409 | - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY (200), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 621 - 628 | - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 40, pages 261 - 268 |