EP2457083 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING A MATERIAL OF AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FABIANI, Elisa 119 rue de Fontabert F-38500 La Buisse / FR | 02 /
RINKEL, Jean 9E place Saint Bruno 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
TABARY, Joachim 2 rue des Violettes F-38100 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
DINTEN, Jean-Marc 138 Avenue des Frères Lumière F-69008 Lyon / FR | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2012/22] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10733003.7 | 19.07.2010 | [2017/04] | WO2010EP60414 | Priority number, date | FR20090055011 | 20.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0955011 | [2012/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011009833 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457083 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457083 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/203, G01V5/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
G01N23/203 (EP,US);
G01V5/222 (EP,US);
G01N2223/615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES MATERIALS EINES OBJEKTES | [2012/22] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING A MATERIAL OF AN OBJECT | [2012/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN MATERIAU D'UN OBJET | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 24.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2010 | AL | 25.01.2017 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | MT | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | IE | 19.07.2017 | LU | 19.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
TR | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS61193057 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5600700 (KRUG KRISTOPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-13* column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 59; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005163282 (ZERLE LUDWIG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0027]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2007036359 (KATZ ELISABETH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, lines 18-23 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [Y] - SHIRO TUZI ET AL, "LOCATING THE POSITIONS OF REINFORCING BARS IN REINFORCED CONCRETE USING BACKSCATTERED GAMMA RAYS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION APPLICATIONS ANDINSTRUMENTATION PART A: APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, PERGAMON PRESS LTD., EXETER, GB, (19900101), vol. 41, no. 10 / 11, pages 1013 - 1018, XP000172902 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0883-2889(90)90168-G | [A] - RUNKLE R C ET AL, "Photon and neutron interrogation techniques for chemical explosives detection in air cargo: A critical review", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A:ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 603, no. 3, ISSN 0168-9002, (20090521), pages 510 - 528, (20090220), XP026097560 [A] 1-13 * pages 520,521 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2009.02.015 | Examination | US2008253525 | by applicant | - J. : PHYS. CHEM., (1975), pages 71 - 538 |