EP2380208 - SOLAR CELL MODULES WITH POLY(VINYL BUTYRAL) ENCAPSULANT COMPRISING UNSATURATED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Rebecca, L. 8 Merrywood Lane Vienna, West Virginia 26105 / US | 02 /
WALL, Jason, S. 1 Palmer Drive Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | 03 /
STIKA, Katherine, M. 511 Runnymeade Road Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10733917.8 | 22.01.2010 | WO2010US21829 | Priority number, date | US20090146535P | 22.01.2009 Original published format: US 146535 P | US20090221771P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221771 P | US20090226435P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226435 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010085664 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380208 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
B32B17/10678 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (KR);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SOLARZELLENMODULE MIT POLY(VINYL-BUTYRAL)-VERKAPSELER UMFASSEND EINE UNGESÄTTIGTE HETEROZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNG | [2011/43] | English: | SOLAR CELL MODULES WITH POLY(VINYL BUTYRAL) ENCAPSULANT COMPRISING UNSATURATED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND | [2011/43] | French: | MODULES DE CELLULE SOLAIRE AVEC ENCAPSULANT DE POLY(VINYLBUTYRALE) COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE INSATURÉ | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 07.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008128018 (HAYES RICHARD ALLEN [US]); | [Y]US5680245 (LYNAM NIALL R [US]); | [Y]US5300414 (LEPPARD DAVID G [CH], et al); | [Y]US5582653 (KATAOKA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP1311001 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | [Y] - GUANGZHOU, "Benzotriazole.", BENZOTRIAZOLE., (2008), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://lihold.com/benzotriazole.htm. | [A] - MERCK & CO., INC, MERCK INDEX. TWELFTH EDITION, (1996), page 186 |