EP2449382 - MAGNETIC SENSOR DEVICE, METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE AND SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/22] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Van Lankvelt, Petrus J. W. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Van Lankvelt, Petrus J. W. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITTMER, Wendy, U. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DE THEIJE, Femke, K. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
IMMINK, Albert, H., J. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
NIEWENHUIS, Jeroen, H. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
VAN LANKVELT, Petrus J. W. c/o High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Wende, Christian Werner, et al DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Marstallstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2012/19] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10734820.3 | 24.06.2010 | [2018/13] | WO2010IB52880 | Priority number, date | EP20090164234 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: EP 09164234 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001337 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449382 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449382 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2449382 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/74, G01N21/552, G01N33/543 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
G01N27/745 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
G01N33/54386 (EP,US);
G01N21/552 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETSENSORVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG UND PROBE | [2012/19] | English: | MAGNETIC SENSOR DEVICE, METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE AND SAMPLE | [2012/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF, ET ÉCHANTILLON | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.04.2019 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2010 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | IE | 24.06.2018 | LU | 24.06.2018 | MT | 24.06.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.06.2010 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
MT | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.06.2010 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
MT | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
MT | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
MT | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 24.06.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.06.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5981297 (BASELT DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 32 - line 54 * * column 7, line 21 - line 37 ** column 8, line 36 - line 48; figures 1,6 *; | [A]WO03054523 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 14; figures 4,5,7,8,12 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 7 * * page 18, line 18 - line 33 *; | [XY]WO2005026689 (I STAT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0021] , [0081] - [0085] - [0090] , [0094] - [0097] - [0125] , [0169] * * claims 1,6,7,12,13,29,41,54,57 * * figure 9 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]WO2007029192 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2 - page 3; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]WO2008072156 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 8,9 * page 1, line 29 - page 4, line 12 * * page 18, line 21 - line 28 * * figure 5 *; | [A]WO2009057024 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - PAEK S-H ET AL, "Irreversible enzyme-shuttle immunoassay", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 1992 MAR 25 US, (19920325), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 753 - 764, XP002599099 [X] 1-4,10,14 * page 753, column r, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 754, column r, paragraph 2 - page 755, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 756, column r, paragraph 3 - page 757, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260390708 | [X] - GRAF E ET AL, "Reverse hybridization on a microplate: A rapid method for the identification of dairy microorganisms", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19980101), vol. 53, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 494 - 498, XP008126593 [X] 1,3,4,7,10,14 * page 494, column r, paragraph 1 - page 495, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 496, column r, paragraph 3 * * tables 1,2 * | Examination | US5679526 | US5939272 | US6696304 | US2007020700 | by applicant | WO2007060601 | WO2008072156 |