EP2456884 - SEQUENCES AND THEIR USE FOR DETECTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF E. COLI O157:H7 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont De Nemours And Company Legal Patent Records Center 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Frank R. 2625 Sorrento Road Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19131 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10734882.3 | 20.07.2010 | WO2010US42570 | Priority number, date | US20090227622P | 22.07.2009 Original published format: US 227622 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011391 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456884 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | 22.02.2012 | ME | 22.02.2012 | RS | 22.02.2012 | Title | German: | SEQUENZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG FÜR DEN NACHWEIS UND DIE CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON E.COLI O157:H7 | [2012/22] | English: | SEQUENCES AND THEIR USE FOR DETECTION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF E. COLI O157:H7 | [2012/22] | French: | SÉQUENCES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA CARACTÉRISATION DE E. COLI O157:H7 | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 13.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03062464 (CA MINISTER HEALTH & WELFARE [CA], et al); | [A]WO2006012323 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [X] - SHARMA ET AL: "Real-time reverse transcription-multiplex PCR for simultaneous and specific detection of rfbE and eae genes of Escherichia coli O157:H7" MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 20, no. 5, 1 October 2006 (2006-10-01), pages 298-306XP024930064 ISSN: 0890-8508 [retrieved on 2006-10-01] | [X] - PERNA N T ET AL: "GENOME SEQUENCE OF ENTEROHAEMORRHAGIC ESCHERICHIA COLI O157:H7" NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/35054089, vol. 409, 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 529-533XP002943756 ISSN: 0028-0836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35054089 | [X] - MAKINO K ET AL: "Complete nucleotide sequence of 93-kb and 3.3-kb plasmids of an enterohemorrhagic Escherichia coli O157:H7 derived from Sakai outbreak" DNA RESEARCH, UNIVERSAL ACADEMY PRESS, JP LNKD- DOI:10.1093/DNARES/5.1.1, vol. 5, no. 1, 2 February 1998 (1998-02-02), pages 1-09XP002091199 ISSN: 1340-2838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/5.1.1 | [X] - WANG L ET AL: "Organization of Escherichia coli O157 O antigen gene cluster and identification of its specific genes" INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 66, no. 8, 1 August 1998 (1998-08-01) , pages 3545-3551XP002233335 ISSN: 0019-9567 | [X] - DATABASE Geneseq [Online] 11 June 2009 (2009-06-11), "Escherichia coli detecting probe sequenceSEQ ID 331." XP002603976 retrieved from EBI accession no. GSN:AWO49752 Database accession no. AWO49752 | [I] - MULL BONNIE ET AL: "Recovery and detection of Escherichia coli O157:H7 in surface water, using ultrafiltration and real-time PCR." APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY JUN 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19363065, vol. 75, no. 11, June 2009 (2009-06), pages 3593-3597XP002603977 ISSN: 1098-5336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02750-08 | [Y] - IBEKWE A M ET AL: "Multiplex fluorogenic real-time PCR for detection and quantification of Escherichia coli O157:H7 in dairy wastewater wetlands" APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1128/AEM.68.10.4853-4862.2002, vol. 68, no. 10, 1 October 2002 (2002-10-01), pages 4853-4862XP008099936 ISSN: 0099-2240 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.10.4853-4862.2002 | [Y] - SHARMA V K ET AL: "Semi-automated fluorogenic PCR assays (TaqMan) forrapid detection of Escherichia coli O157:H7 and other Shiga toxigenic E. coli" MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1006/MCPR.1999.0251, vol. 13, no. 4, 1 August 1999 (1999-08-01) , pages 291-302XP004441558 ISSN: 0890-8508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1999.0251 | [A] - PERELLE S ET AL: "Detection by 5'-nuclease PCR of Shiga-toxin producing Escherichia coli O26, O55, O91, O103, O111, O113, O145 and O157:H7, associated with the world's most frequent clinical cases" MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MCP.2003.12.004, vol. 18, no. 3, 1 June 2004 (2004-06-01), pages 185-192XP004506543 ISSN: 0890-8508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mcp.2003.12.004 | [Y] - SINGH JITENDER ET AL: "A scorpion probe-based real-time PCR assay for detection of E. coli O157:H7 in dairy products." FOODBORNE PATHOGENS AND DISEASE APR 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19272008, vol. 6, no. 3, April 2009 (2009-04), pages 395-400XP002603978 ISSN: 1556-7125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/FPD.2008.0178 | [A] - KLERKS M M ET AL: "Comparison of real-time PCR methods for detection of Salmonella enterica and Escherichia coli O157:H7, and introduction of a general internal amplification control" JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MIMET.2004.07.011, vol. 59, no. 3, 1 December 2004 (2004-12-01), pages 337-349XP004607235 ISSN: 0167-7012 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2004.07.011 | Examination | - CARTERS RACHAEL ET AL, "Design and use of scorpions fluorescent signaling molecules", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS INC, NJ, US, (20080101), vol. 429, doi:10.1007/978-1-60327-040-3_8, ISSN 1064-3745, pages 99 - 115, XP009109946 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-60327-040-3_8 | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US6326145 | EP0320308 | US6171785 | US5994056 | US5804375 | US5538848 | US5487972 | US5210015 | US6312930 | WO9711197 | WO0066777 | US4762857 | US4678812 | - LUKAS M. WICK ET AL.: 'Evolution of Genomic Content in the Stepwise Emerqence of Escherichia coli 0157:H7' JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 187, 2005pages 1783 - 91 | - LUKAS M. WICK ET AL.: 'Evolution of Genomic Content in the Stepwise Emergence of Escherichia coli 0157:H7' JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY vol. 187, 2005pages 1783 - 91 | - TABOR ET AL. PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A. vol. 82, 1985pages 1074 - 1078 | - CARRINO ET AL. J. MICROBIOL METHODS vol. 23, 1995pages 3 - 20 | - PFEFFER VETERINARY RES. COMM. vol. 19, 1995pages 375 - 407 | - BASU ET AL. BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 32, 1993pages 4708 - 4718 | - VAN NESS; CHEN NUCL. ACIDS RES. vol. 19, 1991pages 5143 - 5151 |