EP2456874 - THE USE OF DIMERIZATION DOMAIN COMPONENT STACKS TO MODULATE PLANT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWIT, Shai, J. 2406 133rd Street Urbandale Iowa 50323 / US | 02 /
TOMES, Dwight, T. 7883 103rd Lane Grimes Iowa 50111 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 10735141.3 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010US42231 | Priority number, date | US20090228195P | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 228195 P | US20090286061P | 14.12.2009 Original published format: US 286061 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011273 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456874 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C07C31/08 (US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8242 (EP,US);
C12N15/8255 (US);
C12N15/8269 (US);
C12N15/827 (EP,US);
C12N15/8293 (EP,US);
C12N15/8297 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DIMERISATONSDOMÄNENKOMPONENTENSTAPELN ZUR MODULATION EINER PFLANZENARCHITEKTUR | [2012/22] | English: | THE USE OF DIMERIZATION DOMAIN COMPONENT STACKS TO MODULATE PLANT ARCHITECTURE | [2012/22] | French: | UTILISATION D'EMPILEMENTS DE COMPOSANTS DE DOMAINES DE DIMÉRISATION POUR MODULER L'ARCHITECTURE D'UNE PLANTE | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9909174 (PLANT BIOSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 25 * * page 4, line 11 - line 17 * * page 5, line 1 - line 4 * * page 30, line 3 - line 13 * * sequences 8, 15 * [Y] 4,12-34; | [XY]WO2007124312 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - line 22 * * page 9, line 4 - line 10 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 3 * * page 39, line 18 - line 33 * * page 52, line 7 - line 9 * [Y] 4,12-34; | [Y] - ITOH H ET AL, "The Gebberellin signaling pathway is regulated by the appearance and disappearance of SLENDER RICE 1 in nuclei", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US LNKD- DOI:10.1105/TPC.010319, (20020101), vol. 14, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 57 - 70, XP003012010 [Y] 4,12-34 * abstract * * page 57, column r, line 4 - line 9 * * page 58, column l, line 7 - line 24 * * page 63, column r, line 14 - page 64, column r, line 13 * * Dimer Formation; page 67 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.010319 | [Y] - SUN TAI-PING ET AL, "Molecular mechanism of gibberellin signaling in plants", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PLANT BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 55, ISSN 1040-2519, pages 197 - 223, XP002599865 [Y] 4,12-34 * abstract * * page 205, line 5 - line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.arplant.55.031903.141753 | [A] - PENG JINRONG ET AL, "'Green revolution' genes encode mutant gibberellin response modulators", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/22307, (19990715), vol. 400, no. 6741, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 256 - 261, XP002283524 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/22307 | [AP] - CASSANI ELENA ET AL, "Characterization of the first dominant dwarf maize mutant carrying a single amino acid insertion in the VHYNP domain of the dwarf8 gene", MOLECULAR BREEDING, (200911), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 1380-3743, pages 375 - 385, XP002599866 [AP] 1-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S11032-009-9298-3 | by applicant | US4458066 | US5683439 | WO9630530 | US6504083 | US6300543 | US4945050 | WO9110725 | US5736369 | US5693512 | US5981840 | US4658082 | US5262306 | EP0604662 | EP0672752 | US5565350 | US5942657 | US5034323 | US5283184 | US2002048814 | US5759829 | WO9949029 | WO9953050 | WO9961631 | WO0049035 | US2003175965 | US2003180945 | WO0200904 | US6646805 | US4987071 | US6453242 | US2003037355 | US5962764 | US5731181 | US5756325 | US5760012 | US5795972 | US5871984 | WO9849350 | WO9907865 | WO9925821 | US2003074698 | US6232529 | US5990389 | US5885801 | US5885802 | US5703409 | WO9820122 | US5366892 | US5747450 | US5737514 | US5723756 | US5593881 | US5792931 | US5952544 | WO9411516 | US5602321 | US5583210 | WO9961619 | WO0017364 | US5703049 | US5850016 | WO9820133 | US5736514 | WO9832326 | EP0486233 | - SINCLAIR, CROP SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 38, pages 638 - 643 | - TOLLENAAR; WU, CROP SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 39, pages 1597 - 1604 | - DUVICK; CASSMAN, CROP SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 39, pages 1622 - 1630 | - APPENZELLER ET AL., CELLULOSE, (2004), vol. 11, pages 287 - 299 | - ISHIZUKA ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIAL., (1993), vol. 139, pages 425 - 32 | - YAMAO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 2306 - 2309 | - MURRAY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 477 - 98 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 138, pages 267 - 84 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 53 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, GENE, (1988), vol. 73, pages 237 - 44 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 3 | - CORPET ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 10881 - 90 | - HUANG ET AL., COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN THE BIOSCIENCES, (1992), vol. 8, pages 155 - 65 | - PEARSON ET AL., METH. MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 307 - 31 | - FENG; DOOLITTLE, J. MOL. EVOL., (1987), vol. 25, pages 351 - 60 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 53 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 | - WOOTEN; FEDERHEN, COMPUT. CHEM., (1993), vol. 17, pages 149 - 63 | - CLAVERIE; STATES, COMPUT. CHEM., (1993), vol. 17, pages 191 - 201 | - MEYERS; MILLER, COMPUTER APPLIC. BIOL. SCI., (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - NARANG; 1979 ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., vol. 68, pages 90 - 9 | - BROWN; 1979 ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., vol. 68, pages 109 - 51 | - BEAUCAGE; 1981, TETRA. LETTS., vol. 22, no. 20, pages 1859 - 62 | - NEEDHAM-VANDEVANTER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 6159 - 68 | - KOZAK, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, page 8125 | - DRUMMOND ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, page 7375 | - RAO ET AL., MOL. AND CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, page 284 | - DEVEREAUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4504 - 9 | - ZHAO ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (1998), vol. 16, pages 258 - 61 | - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 810 - 2 | - MCELROY ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), pages 163 - 171 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 12, pages 619 - 632 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 675 - 89 | - LAST ET AL., THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1991), vol. 81, pages 581 - 8 | - VELTEN ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 2723 - 30 | - LEPETIT ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1992), vol. 231, pages 276 - 85 | - ATANASSVOA ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 291 - 300 | - BEVAN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 12, pages 369 - 85 | - KEIL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 5641 - 50 | - AN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 115 - 22 | - MOGEN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 72 | - BUCHMAN; BERG, MOL. CELL, (1988), vol. 8, pages 4395 - 4405 | - CALLIS ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 1183 - 200 | - DRATEWKA-KOS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 4896 - 900 | - DELOOSE ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 99, pages 95 - 100 | - MATSUKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 834 | - WILKINS ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 301 - 13 | - LIND ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 47 - 53 | - RAHMATULLAH ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 12, page 119 | - VERWAERT ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 26, pages 189 - 202 | - ROGERS ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 253 - 77 | - SCHARDL ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 61, pages 1 - 11 | - BERGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 8402 - 6 | - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1977), vol. 198, page 1056 | - GOEDDEL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057 | - SHIMATAKE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, page 128 | - PALVA ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 22, pages 229 - 35 | - MOSBACH ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 302, pages 543 - 5 | - QUEEN ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1986), vol. 89, page 49 | - SCHNEIDER, J. EMBRYOL. EXP. MORPHOL., (1987), vol. 27, pages 353 - 65 | - SPRAGUE ET AL., J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 45, pages 773 - 81 | - HORSCH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 227, pages 1229 - 31 | - GRUBER ET AL., "Vectors for Plant Transformation", METHODS IN PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, pages 89 - 119 | - CROSSWAY ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, pages 320 - 334 | - RIGGS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 5602 - 5606 | - PASZKOWSKI ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 2717 - 2722 | - MCCABE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 923 - 926 | - WEISSINGER ET AL., ANN. REV. GENET., (1988), vol. 22, pages 421 - 477 | - SANFORD ET AL., PARTICULATE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 27 - 37 | - CHRISTOU ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 87, pages 671 - 674 | - DATTA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 736 - 740 | - KLEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 4305 - 4309 | - KLEIN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 559 - 563 | - KLEIN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 91, pages 440 - 444 | - FROMM ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839 | - GORDON-KAMM ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618 | - HOOYDAAS-VAN SLOGTEREN; HOOYKAAS, NATURE, (1984), vol. 311, pages 763 - 764 | - BYTEBIER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5345 - 5349 | - KAEPPLER ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1990), vol. 9, pages 415 - 418 | - KAEPPLER ET AL., THEOR. APP/. GENET., (1992), vol. 84, pages 560 - 566 | - D'HALLUIN ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505 | - LI ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1993), vol. 12, pages 250 - 255 | - CHRISTOU; FORD, ANNALS OF BOTANY, (1995), vol. 75, pages 407 - 413 | - OSJODA, NATURE BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750 | - FRAME ET AL., PLANT J., (1994), vol. 6, pages 941 - 948 | - GUO ET AL., PHYSIOLOGIA PLANTARUM, (1995), vol. 93, pages 19 - 24 | - BAO ET AL., ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE & BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 23, pages 953 - 959 | - FINER; FINER, LETT APPL MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 30, pages 406 - 10 | - AMOAH ET AL., J EXP BOT, (2001), vol. 52, pages 1135 - 42 | - KRENS ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 72 - 77 | - FROMM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 5824 - 5828 | - CROSSWAY ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1986), vol. 202, pages 179 - 185 | - KADO, CRIT. REV. PLANT SCI., (1991), vol. 10, page 1 | - MOLONEY ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1989), vol. 8, page 238 | - BENFEY; CHUA, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 174 - 81 | - SIMPSON ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, pages 403 - 15 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 745 - 50 | - SHAHIN, THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1985), vol. 69, pages 235 - 40 | - HIEI ET AL., THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 6, pages 271 - 82 | - SANFORD ET AL., PART. SCI. TECHNOL., (1987), vol. 5, page 27 | - SANFORD, TRENDS BIOTECH, (1988), vol. 6, page 299 | - SANFORD, PHYSIOL. PLANT, (1990), vol. 79, page 206 | - KLEIN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, page 268 | - ZANG ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, page 996 | - DESHAYES ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 2731 | - CHRISTOU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 3962 | - HAIN ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1985), vol. 199, page 161 | - DRAPER ET AL., PLANT CELL PHYSIOL., (1982), vol. 23, page 451 | - DONN ET AL., ABSTRACTS OF THE VLLTH INT1. CONGRESS ON PLANT CELL AND TISSUE CULTURE IAPTC, (1990), vol. A2-38, page 53 | - D'HALLUIN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 505 | - SPENCER ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 51 - 61 | - BROIN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 1417 - 1432 | - FLAVELL ET AL., PROC: NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3490 - 3496 | - JORGENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 31, pages 957 - 973 | - JOHANSEN; CARRINGTON, PLANT PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 126, pages 930 - 938 | - BROIN, PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 1417 - 1432 | - STOUTJESDIJK ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 129, pages 1723 - 1731 | - PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 63, pages 753 - 763 | - LIU ET AL., PLANT PHYSIO/., (2002), vol. 129, pages 1732 - 1743 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 13959 - 13964 | - LIU ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 129, pages 1732 - 1743 | - WATERHOUSE; HELLIWELL, NAT. REV. GENET., (2003), vol. 4, pages 29 - 38 | - CHUANG; MEYEROWITZ, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 4985 - 4990 | - PANDOLFINI ET AL., BMC BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 3, page 7 | - PANSTRUGA ET AL., MOL. BIOL. REP., (2003), vol. 30, pages 135 - 140 | - SMITH ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, pages 319 - 320 | - WESLEY ET AL., PLANT J., (2001), vol. 27, pages 581 - 590 | - WANG; WATERHOUSE, CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2001), vol. 5, pages 146 - 150 | - HELLIWELL; WATERHOUSE, METHODS, (2003), vol. 30, pages 289 - 295 | - ANGELL; BAULCOMBE, EMBO J., (1997), vol. 16, pages 3675 - 3684 | - ANGELL; BAULCOMBE, PLANT J., (1999), vol. 20, pages 357 - 362 | - JAVIER ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 257 - 263 | - CONRAD; SONNEWALD, NATURE BIOTECH., (2003), vol. 21, pages 35 - 36 | - MAES ET AL., TRENDS PLANT SCI., (1999), vol. 4, pages 90 - 96 | - DHARMAPURI; SONTI, FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 179, pages 53 - 59 | - MEISSNER ET AL., PLANT J., (2000), vol. 22, pages 265 - 274 | - PHOGAT ET AL., J. BIOSCI., (2000), vol. 25, pages 57 - 63 | - WALBOT, CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (2000), vol. 2, pages 103 - 107 | - GAI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 94 - 96 | - FITZMAURICE ET AL., GENETICS, (1999), vol. 153, pages 1919 - 1928 | - BENSEN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1995), vol. 7, pages 75 - 84 | - MENA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 1537 - 1540 | - OHSHIMA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 243, pages 472 - 481 | - OKUBARA ET AL., GENETICS, (1994), vol. 137, pages 867 - 874 | - QUESADA ET AL., GENETICS, (2000), vol. 154, pages 421 - 436 | - MCCALLUM ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 18, pages 455 - 457 | - GRUIS ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2002), vol. 14, pages 2863 - 2882 | - KUSABA ET AL., PLANT CELL, (2003), vol. 15, pages 1455 - 1467 | - BEETHAM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 8774 - 8778 | - WERNER ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 18, pages 10487 - 10492 | - WERNER, PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 10487 - 10492 | - MOURADOV ET AL., THE PLANT CELL, (2002), pages S111 - S130 | - RUSHTON ET AL., CURR. OPIN. PLANT BIOL., (1998), vol. 1, pages 311 - 315 | - WILLIAMSON ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 165, pages 99 - 106 | - PEDERSEN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, page 6279 | - KIRIHARA ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 71, page 359 | - MUSUMURA ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 12, page 123 | - GEISER ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 48, page 109 | - VAN DAMME ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 825 | - JONES ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, page 789 | - MARTIN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, page 1432 | - MINDRINOS ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, page 1089 | - SCHUBERT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1988), vol. 170, pages 5837 - 5847 | - FRIAS, PLANT CELL, (1996), vol. 8, pages 1533 - 44 | - SPALDING ET AL., J GEN PHYSIOL, (1999), vol. 113, pages 909 - 18 | - CHENG ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL, (1995), vol. 108, page 881 | - SUKANYA ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1994), vol. 26, pages 1935 - 46 | - DUFF ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1997), vol. 27, pages 16749 - 16752 | - ARREDONDO-PETER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1997), vol. 115, pages 1259 - 1266 | - ARREDONDO-PETER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 114, pages 493 - 500 | - MARTIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, page 1432 | - VILARDELL ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1990), vol. 14, pages 423 - 432 | - BRUCE ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (2002), vol. 53, pages 1 - 13 | - BOWER ET AL., MOLEC BREED, (1996), vol. 2, pages 239 - 249 | - SANTOSA ET AL., MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 28, pages 113 - 119 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812 | - GRITZ ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 25, pages 179 - 188 | - MALONE-SCHONEBERG ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 103, pages 199 - 207 | - SCHRAMMEIJER ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1990), vol. 9, pages 55 - 60 | - MURASHIGE ET AL., PHYSIOL. PLANT., (1962), vol. 15, pages 473 - 497 | - BIDNEY ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 301 - 313 | - HOLSTERS ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1978), vol. 163, pages 181 - 187 | - LUO ET AL., PLANT CELL REP, (2004), vol. 22, pages 645 - 652 | - LEE, INT RICE RES NEWSL, (1996), vol. 21, pages 2 - 3 | - HARTLEY, J MO/ BIOL, (1988), vol. 202, pages 913 - 915 | - HUQ ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 113, page 305 | - MURASHIGE; SKOOG, PHYSIOL PLANT, (1962), vol. 15, pages 473 - 497 | - JEFFERSON, PLANT MOL BIOL REP, (1987), vol. 5, pages 387 - 405 | - LUO ET AL., MOL BREED, (1995), vol. 1, pages 51 - 63 | WO1996US19256 | US19860913914 | US19860913913 | WO1993US03868 | US20010053410 | US20010005429 | US19960740682 |