EP2454834 - AUTOMATIC INTERFACING BETWEEN A MASTER DEVICE AND OBJECT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MC, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROB, Matthew, S. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
DIAZ SPINDOLA, Serafin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
WRIGHT, Gerald, V., Jr. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
KEATING, Virginia, Walker 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2012/21] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10735401.1 | 16.07.2010 | [2020/13] | WO2010US42318 | Priority number, date | US20090226545P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226545 P | US20090226552P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226552 P | US20100786886 | 25.05.2010 Original published format: US 786886 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009069 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2454834 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454834 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04L29/06, H04W4/80, G06K9/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/00315 (EP,US);
H04H60/35 (KR);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/00408 (EP,US);
H04N1/0044 (EP,US);
H04N23/64 (US);
H04N23/66 (US);
H04N7/185 (US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0013 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | H04H60/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE KOPPLUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM MASTER-GERÄT UND EINEM OBJEKT-GERÄT | [2012/21] | English: | AUTOMATIC INTERFACING BETWEEN A MASTER DEVICE AND OBJECT DEVICE | [2012/21] | French: | MISE EN INTERFACE AUTOMATIQUE D UN DISPOSITIF MAÎTRE ET D UN DISPOSITIF OBJET | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12007994.2 / EP2597796 | EP20158006.5 / EP3678309 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IE | 16.07.2020 | LU | 16.07.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 25.03.2020 | |
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 25.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002190128 (LEVINE ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1,15,31,41 * abstract *; | [XY]WO03041000 (BONCYK WAYNE C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,15-21,26,32-35,40,41 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 36, line 22 - line 25 * [Y] 7-9,23-25,37-39; | [Y]EP1447944 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 11,13,14,27,29,30 * figures 4-6 *; | [Y]EP1571584 (HONDA RES INST EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7-9,11,13,14,23-25,27,29,30,37-39 * abstract ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * | Examination | US2006028557 |