EP2395922 - BIOLOGICAL SAMPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetic Technologies Limited 60-66 Hanover Street Fitzroy, VIC 3065 / AU | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOM, Eduardo Genetic Technologies Limited 60-66 Hanover Street Fitzroy, Victoria 3065 / AU | 02 /
LEWIS, Craig Matthew 16 Hartland Way Eltham Victoria 3095 / AU | 03 /
ALLMAN, Richard 20 Pedder Street Wyndham Vale Victoria 3024 / AU | 04 /
MANTZARIS, Debbie 24 The Crossway South Avondale Heights Victoria 3034 / AU | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Susan Joan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Harrison, Susan Joan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane GB-London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10735423.5 | 25.01.2010 | WO2010AU00071 | Priority number, date | US20090147718P | 27.01.2009 Original published format: US 147718 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010085841 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395922 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, A61B10/02 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61B10/0291 (EP,US);
A61B90/06 (EP,US);
A61F13/38 (US);
A61B10/0096 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0074 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0216 (EP,US);
A61B2090/036 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0807 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTNAHME BIOLOGISCHER PROBEN | [2011/51] | English: | BIOLOGICAL SAMPLING DEVICE | [2011/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉLÈVEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3877464 (VERMES ANDREW R) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 25; figures 3-4 *; | [X]US4194513 (PALMER CATHERINE G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-15 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]GB2126100 (MODELL CLARE BERNADETTE, et al) [X] 1,2,7,9-12,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 27 * * page 1, line 89 - page 2, line 30; figures 1, 4 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [XAY]US4681123 (VALTCHEV KONSTANTIN L [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 10 - line 40 * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-6 * [A] 5[Y] 8; | [Y]EP0363196 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 3,8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5106377 (MARTIN GEOFFREY S [CA]) [X] 1,2,9-13,15 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6059735 (SGRO JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-2 * | International search | [X]US3877464 (VERMES ANDREW R); | [Y]US3995636 (MURRAY JEROME L, et al); | [X]GB2126100 (MODELL CLARE BERNADETTE, et al); | [X]EP0363196 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]CN2134162Y (RU MEIYAN [CN]); | [X]US6059735 (SGRO JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]); | [Y]US6346086 (MAKSEM JOHN A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004126796 |