EP2382971 - ORALLY DISINTEGRATING TABLET HAVING INNER CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | [2014/48] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATONO, Mitsuhiro c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hirohisa c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Yuki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP | 04 /
OCHIAI, Yasushi c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 3-45 Kurakakiuchi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0878 / JP | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10735924.2 | 29.01.2010 | WO2010JP51294 | Priority number, date | JP20090018677 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009018677 | [2011/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087462 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382971 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/30, A61K47/02, A61K47/20, A61K47/22, A61K47/46, A61K9/00, A61K9/28 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/2813 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/2826 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/286 (CN);
A61K9/2893 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | A61K9/30, A61K47/02, A61K47/20, A61K47/22, A61K47/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IM MUND ZERFALLENDE TABLETTE MIT INNEREM KERN | [2011/44] | English: | ORALLY DISINTEGRATING TABLET HAVING INNER CORE | [2011/44] | French: | COMPRIMÉ À DÉSINTÉGRATION ORALE COMPORTANT UN NOYAU INTÉRIEUR | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2011 | Translation filed | 28.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005202082 (HIBINO TSUNEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* examples 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2007065448 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 16 - page 17; tables 2, 6 *; | [Y]US2008269301 (YOKOE JUNICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * examples 1-4 *; | [E]EP2415466 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [E] 1,3-5,10 * examples 6-26 *; | [A] - DESAI D S ET AL, "Photostabilization of uncoated tablets of sorivudine and nifedipine by incorporation of synthetic iron oxides", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 103, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(94)90204-6, ISSN 0378-5173, (19940225), pages 69 - 76, (19940225), XP025577911 [A] 1-10 * page 70 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(94)90204-6 | International search | [Y]WO03028706 (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007052592 (KOWA CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH04346929 (TAKADA SEIYAKU KK); | [Y]JP2003104887 (MARUKO PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [Y]JPS58109415 (TEISAN SEIYAKU KK); | [Y]JPS4828621 (BAYER AG.); | [Y]JPS5522645 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO) | Examination | - THOMA K ET AL, "Photostabilization of drugs in dosage forms without protection from packaging materials", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 67, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(91)90429-R, ISSN 0378-5173, (19910115), pages 169 - 175, (19910115), XP025557819 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(91)90429-R | by applicant | JPS5522645 | JP2003104888 | JP2000007583 | JP2003028706 | JP2007091648 |