EP2384340 - STYRENIC POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHULER, Joe 3013 Wood Hollow Drive League City TX 77573 / US | 02 /
SOSA, Jose 610 Kingston Court Deer Park TX 77536 / US | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Leyder, Francis Total Reseach & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | ||
Former [2011/45] | Neel, Henry Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 10736192.5 | 14.01.2010 | WO2010US20977 | Priority number, date | US20090363418 | 30.01.2009 Original published format: US 363418 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010088051 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384340 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00, C08F6/00, C08L25/04 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
C08F6/005 (EP,US);
C08F112/08 (US);
C08J11/02 (US);
C08J3/20 (US);
C08J9/0052 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J9/0095 (EP,US);
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08J9/16 (EP,US);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
C08J2325/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/005, C08L25/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/45] | C08F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STYROLPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2011/45] | English: | STYRENIC POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2011/45] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE STYRÉNIQUE ET LEURS MÉTHODES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 25.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001329128 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-14* paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016]; examples 1-5 *; | [XA]EP1882704 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-10 * zeolite Y;; example 1; table 1 * [A] 11-14; | [XA]WO2008065098 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 3,4,13,14,25 * [A] 11-14; | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "RESIDUAL STYRENE MONOMER REDUCTION IN SYNDIOTACTIC POLYSTRYRENES", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19941001), no. 366, ISSN 0374-4353, page 557/558, XP000485871 [X] 1-11 * page 557 - page 558 * [A] 12-14 | International search | [A]US6156842 (HOENIG STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [X]US6348636 (RACZ ROBERT [US]); | [Y]US2003073792 (MOORE EUGENE R [US]); | [A]US2003088010 (SENNINGER THIERRY [FR]); | [A]US2006189757 (REIMERS JAY [US]); | [Y]US2008188607 (GUERRIERI WILLIAM [US], et al) |