EP2391428 - ATHLETIC PERFORMANCE RATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Nike International, Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMSI, Kristopher, L. Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | 02 /
ANNIS, David, H. Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10736485.3 | 29.01.2010 | WO2010US22602 | Priority number, date | US20090148293P | 29.01.2009 Original published format: US 148293 P | US20090149251P | 02.02.2009 Original published format: US 149251 P | US20090559082 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: US 559082 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010088529 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391428 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/00, G06Q10/06 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
A63B24/0062 (EP);
A63B71/0616 (EP);
G06Q10/0639 (EP);
A63B2024/0065 (EP);
A63B2024/0068 (EP);
A63B2225/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/49] | A63B71/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 25.07.2011 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEWERTUNG SPORTLICHER LEISTUNGEN | [2011/49] | English: | ATHLETIC PERFORMANCE RATING SYSTEM | [2011/49] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉVALUATION DE PERFORMANCE ATHLÉTIQUE | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [Y]US2007026974 (MARTY ET AL.); | [Y]US2008096726 (RILEY ET AL.); | [Y]US6183425 (WHALEN ET AL.); | [A]US2008033581 (DOSHI ET AL.); | [A]US2005223799 (MURPHY); | [E]US2010030350 (HOUSE ET AL.) |