EP2392166 - TARGETED GROUP SCALING FOR ENHANCED DISTRIBUTED SPECTRUM SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Solutions, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg IL 60196 / US | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KYPEROUNTAS, Spyros 1506 Maple Drive Weston, FL 33327 / US | 02 /
CORREAL, Neiyer, S. 2925 Cardinal Drive Cooper City, FL 33026 / US | 03 /
SHI, Qicai 5050 NW 125 Ave Coral Springs, FL 33076 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2011/49] | 01 /
KYPEROUNTAS, Spyros 1506 Maple Drive Weston, FL 33327 / US | ||
02 /
CORREAL, Neiyer, S. 2925 Cardinal Drive Cooper City, FL 33026 / US | |||
03 /
SHI, Qicai 5462 NW 122ND Drive Coral Springs, FL 33076 / US | Representative(s) | Treleven, Colin Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Treleven, Colin Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10736521.5 | 01.02.2010 | [2015/46] | WO2010US22726 | Priority number, date | US20090363855 | 02.02.2009 Original published format: US 363855 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010088598 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2392166 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2392166 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, // H04W16/14, H04W48/16 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/49] | H04W16/10, H04W16/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TARGETGRUPPENSKALIERUNG FÜR DIE ERWEITERTE VERTEILTE SPEKTRUMSFÜHLUNG | [2011/49] | English: | TARGETED GROUP SCALING FOR ENHANCED DISTRIBUTED SPECTRUM SENSING | [2011/49] | French: | MISE À L'ÉCHELLE D'UN GROUPE CIBLÉ PERMETTANT UNE MEILLEURE DÉTECTION DE SPECTRE RÉPARTIE | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 12.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2010 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | IE | 01.02.2016 | LU | 01.02.2016 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.02.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.02.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.02.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
IE | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2016 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008233991 (GILLIG STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0008] - [0014] - [0016] , [0018] - [0028] * [I] 3,4,6,7,9,10,13,14; | [A]US2008261639 (SUN CHUNHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0009] , [0021] - [0046] - [0052] - [0055] - [0059] - [0071]; claims 1,7 *; | [A] - YNGVE SELEN ET AL, "Sensor Selection for Cooperative Spectrum Sensing", NEW FRONTIERS IN DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS NETWORKS, 2008. DYSPAN 2008. 3RD IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081014), ISBN 978-1-4244-2016-2, pages 1 - 11, XP031353290 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - CHUNMEI QI ET AL, "Weighted-Clustering Cooperative Spectrum Sensing in Cognitive Radio Context", COMMUNICATIONS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, 2009. CMC '09. WRI INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090106), ISBN 978-0-7695-3501-2, pages 102 - 106, XP031434634 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - CHIA-HAN LEE ET AL, "Multiple Access-Inspired Cooperative Spectrum Sensing for Cognitive Radio", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2007. MILCOM 2007. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071029), ISBN 978-1-4244-1512-0, pages 1 - 6, XP031232378 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - TAO CHEN ET AL, "CogMesh: A Cluster-Based Cognitive Radio Network", 2007 2ND IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON NEW FRONTIERS IN DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS NETWORKS : [DYSPAN 2007] ; DUBLIN, IRELAND, 17 - 20 APRIL 2007, IEEE, US, (20070401), ISBN 978-1-4244-0663-0, pages 168 - 178, XP031095616 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR100808045B (INHA-INDUSTRY PARTNERSHIP INSTITUTE); | [A]US2008112427 (SEIDEL SCOTT Y [US], et al); | [A]KR100872819B (INHA-INDUSTRY PARTNERSHIP INSTITUTE); | [A]US2009016293 (KANG BUB-JOO [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2008233991 |