EP2457252 - PACKAGING OR MOUNTING A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novalia Ltd The Quorum Barnwell Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB5 8RE / GB | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STONE, Kate 71a Roseford Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 2HA / GB | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10736785.6 | 30.06.2010 | WO2010GB51074 | Priority number, date | GB20090012742 | 22.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0912742 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011010118 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457252 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457252 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/00, H01L33/48 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L21/02 (GB);
H01L21/50 (GB);
H01L21/64 (GB);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H05K3/30 (GB);
H05K3/305 (GB);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7965 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L23/49838 (EP,US);
H01L23/4985 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L25/0655 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01021 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01027 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01061 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19043 (EP,US);
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/83 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1461, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG ODER MONTAGE EINER KOMPONENTE | [2012/22] | English: | PACKAGING OR MOUNTING A COMPONENT | [2012/22] | French: | MISE SOUS BOÎTIER OU MONTAGE D'UN COMPOSANT | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 06.08.2014 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5331512 (ORTON KEVIN R [US]); | [I]US5822191 (TAGUSA YASUNOBU [JP], et al); | [X]US2007053310 (ISHIZAWA HARUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2007184629 (BOGNER GEORG [DE], et al); | [I]US2007281391 (ITO KYOSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]GB2453765 (NOVALIA LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US5822191 | US2007053310 | US2007281391 |