EP2459005 - PROCESS FOR DUSTING ANIMAL FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IAMS Europe B.V. Vosmatenweg 4 7742 PB Coevorden / NL | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states The Iams Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states The IAMS Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states The IAMS Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORRIGAN, Patrick, Joseph 6 Richardson Dr. Glendale Ohio 45246 / US | 02 /
HOUSTON, Michelle, Marie 8796 Carey Wood Ln. West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
SUNVOLD, Gregory, Dean 3158 Minnich-Wysong Rd. Lewisburg Ohio 45338 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/18] | Creek, Isobel Clare Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2013/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/23] | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 10737202.1 | 21.07.2010 | [2016/12] | WO2010US42718 | Priority number, date | US20090533032 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: US 533032 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011014391 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459005 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2459005 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2459005 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/00, A23K50/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A23K40/10 (EP,US);
A23K10/18 (US);
A23K20/00 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K40/25 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3204, A23V2200/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | A23K1/00, A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DAS VERSTREUEN VON TIERFUTTERMITTEL | [2012/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR DUSTING ANIMAL FOOD | [2012/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE SAUPOUDRAGE D'ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTÄUBUNG VON TIERFUTTER | ||
Former [2012/23] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE POUDRAGE D'ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2014
10.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Street Topeka, Kansas 66603 / US Opponent's representative Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2014
10.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Street Topeka, Kansas 66603 / US Opponent's representative Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | 20.03.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.06.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.01.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2010 | AL | 08.05.2013 | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | IE | 21.07.2013 | LU | 21.07.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.07.2010 | |
AT | 08.05.2013 | ||
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
LU | 21.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 21.07.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2299257 (MOORMAN MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, lines 12-25 * * page 3, lines 5-11 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 17 * * claims 1,5,6,7 *; | [I]US5968569 (CAVADINI CHRISTOF [CH], et al) [I] 1-16 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, lines 3-55 * * column 4, lines 50-51 * * column 5, lines 15-35 * * column 5, lines 66-67 * * column 7, lines 1-7 * * example 7 *; | [A]US2005153018 (UBBINK JOHAN B [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] - [0017] - [0055] , [0057] , [0058] , [0062] - [0063] - [0080] - [0083] * * examples 1,3 * * claims 13-14 *; | [I]US2005170067 (SHAO CHEN C [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0011] - [0012] - [0018] - [0019] - [0023] - [0025] - [0031] - [0036] * * claims 1,6-9,11 *; | [AD]US2006228448 (BOILEAU THOMAS W [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0017] - [0020] - [0030] , [0032] - [0035] - [0039] - [0045] ** paragraphs [0127] , [0131] *; | [AD]WO2008076975 (ADVANCED BIONUTRITION CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0052] , [0077] , [0097] * | by applicant | WO03075676 | WO2005060707 | US2005152884 | US2005158294 | US2005158293 | US2005175598 | US2006228448 | US2006269634 | US2006270020 | WO2008076975 | - ASTM, (1995), vol. E, pages 11 - 70 | Opposition | US3997675 | US2003190309 | US2005158291 | WO2005092116 | - BIOURGE V. ET AL, "Nutrition and Disease", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1998), vol. 128, pages 2730S - 2732S |