EP2454604 - METHOD FOR CALIBRATING A PROPAGATION-TIME-BASED LOCALIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacher Platz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHENKO, Maksym Baderseestr. 17 81373 München / DE | 02 /
RAMIREZ, Alejandro Hornstr. 22 80797 München / DE | 03 /
SCHWINGENSCHLÖGL, Christian Kameterweg 7 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 10737311.0 | 16.07.2010 | [2016/23] | WO2010EP60343 | Priority number, date | DE20091033603 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009033603 | [2012/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011006998 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454604 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454604 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, G01S13/46 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G01S5/021 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (EP,US);
G01S2013/466 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | G01S5/02, G01S13/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG EINES LAUFZEITBASIERTEN LOKALISATIONSSYSTEMS | [2012/21] | English: | METHOD FOR CALIBRATING A PROPAGATION-TIME-BASED LOCALIZATION SYSTEM | [2012/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CALIBRAGE D'UN SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION BASÉ SUR LE TEMPS DE PROPAGATION | [2016/03] |
Former [2012/21] | PROCÉDÉ DE CALIBRAGE D UN SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION BASÉ SUR LE TEMPS DE PROPAGATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 27.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2010 | AL | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | MT | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | AT | 16.07.2016 | IE | 16.07.2016 | LU | 16.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 16.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
MT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 16.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 16.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 16.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 16.07.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
IE | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 16.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE102006045350 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 10-16 * paragraph [0040]; figure 3 * [A] 1-9; | [A]US2003001777 (JOHNSON MARK J [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [ADP]DE102008021614 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [ADP] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2010059934 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-16 * the whole document * | [XA] - BAHILLO A ET AL, "IEEE 802.11 Distance Estimation Based on RTS/CTS Two-Frame Exchange Mechanism", 2009 IEEE 69TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE; APRIL 26-29, 2009, BARCELONA, SPAIN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090426), ISBN 978-1-4244-2517-4, pages 1 - 5, XP031474530 [X] 10-16 * the whole document * [A] 1-9 | [XA] - IZQUIERDO F ET AL, "Performance evaluation of a TOA-based trilateration method to locate terminals in WLAN", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WIRELESS PERVASIVE COMPUTING, XX, XX, (20060116), vol. 2006, pages 1 - 6, XP002467036 [X] 10-16 * the whole document * [A] 1-9 | [A] - SANG YOUNG PARK ET AL, "Round-trip time-based wireless positioning without time synchronization", CONTROL, AUTOMATION AND SYSTEMS, 2007. ICCAS '07. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071017), ISBN 978-89-950038-6-2, pages 2323 - 2326, XP031223939 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2008EP68162 |