EP2438745 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CREATING VIRTUAL UNIVERSAL PLUG-AND-PLAY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Bruce, Kelly 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 02 /
CAUNTER, Mark, Leslie 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | 03 /
GEACH, Steven, Richard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2012/15] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10737668.3 | 03.06.2010 | WO2010US37250 | Priority number, date | US20090183761P | 03.06.2009 Original published format: US 183761 P | US20090642853 | 20.12.2009 Original published format: US 642853 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010141714 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2438745 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2438745 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/24 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L41/50 (US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L67/1059 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1061 (US);
H04L67/1068 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/2582 (US);
H04L67/1093 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | H04L29/08, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VIRTUELLER UNIVERSELLER PLUG-AND-PLAY-SYSTEME | [2012/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CREATING VIRTUAL UNIVERSAL PLUG-AND-PLAY SYSTEMS | [2012/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE CRÉER DES SYSTÈMES PLUG-AND-PLAY (PRÊT À UTILISER) VIRTUELS UNIVERSELS | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 18.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2010 | AL | 23.07.2014 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.06.2010 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MK | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 03.06.2010 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO03049370 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-8,11-18,21-28,31-38 * abstract * * page 3, lines 17-28 * * page 7, line 1 - page 11, line 7 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2005012829 (TASHIRO ATSUSHI [US], et al) [X] 9,10,19,20,29,30,39,40 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] ** figure 1 *; | [X]US2005232583 (KUBOTA TSUKASA [JP]) [X] 9,10,19,20,29,30,39,40 * paragraphs [0049] - [0052] * * figures 2,9,10 *; | [I]EP1742153 (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1-8,11-18,21-28,31-38 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0053] * * figures 1,17 *; | [X]EP1771008 (NOVELL INC [US]) [X] 9,10,19,20,29,30,39,40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0018] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]WO2008087374 (ELECTRIC POCKET LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,11-15,21-24,31-34 * abstract * * page 7, lines 5-9 * * page 9, line 18 - page 16, line 11 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 1-8,11-18,21-28,31-38; | [I] - TAEIN HWANG ET AL, "Personal Mobile A/V Control Point for Home-to-Home Media Streaming", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, 2008. ICCE 2008. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080109), ISBN 978-1-4244-1458-1, pages 1 - 2, XP031297429 [I] 1-8,11-18,21-28,31-38 * section II;;; figures 1-3 * | [I] - IL-WOO LEE ET AL, "Service Platform and Social Networking Service Based on Peer-to-Peer Networking", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2009. CCNC 2009. 6TH IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090110), ISBN 978-1-4244-2308-8, pages 1 - 2, XP031425426 [I] 1-8,11-18,21-28,31-38 * section II;;; figures 2,3 * |