EP2467528 - METHOD OF OPERATING A STEAM GENERATOR OF A LAUNDRY APPLIANCE, AND LAUNDRY APPLIANCE FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORNY, Piotr Mickiewicza 15b m8 PL-56-500 Syców / PL | 02 /
KACZMAREK, Tomasz Seegefelder Strasse 195 13583 Berlin / DE | 03 /
MAINKA, Josef Puccinistraße 27 13088 Berlin / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 10737936.4 | 05.08.2010 | [2015/42] | WO2010EP61415 | Priority number, date | EP20090168039 | 18.08.2009 Original published format: EP 09168039 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020707 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467528 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467528 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, D06F75/12, D06F39/00, F22B1/28, D06F73/00 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
D06F39/40 (EP,US);
D06F58/34 (EP,US);
D06F34/20 (EP,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,US);
D06F75/12 (EP);
F22B1/285 (EP);
F22D5/32 (EP);
D06F2103/00 (EP,US);
D06F2103/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DAMPFGENERATORS EINES WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSGERÄTES UND WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSGERÄT | [2015/27] | English: | METHOD OF OPERATING A STEAM GENERATOR OF A LAUNDRY APPLIANCE, AND LAUNDRY APPLIANCE FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD | [2012/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR DE VAPEUR D'UN APPAREIL DE TRAÎTMENT DU LINGE ET APPAREIL DE TRAÎTMENT DU LINGE | [2015/27] |
Former [2012/26] | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINES DAMPFGENERATORS EINER WASCHMASCHINE UND WASCHMASCHINE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2012/26] | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR DE VAPEUR D'UN APPAREIL DE LAVAGE DE LINGE, ET APPAREIL DE LAVAGE DE LINGE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2010 | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0175360 (IMETEC SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, line 31 - page 14, line 2; figures 1-2 * [I] 2-4,7,8; | [A]EP1464750 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0041]; figures 4,6 ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] *; | [XI]EP1887123 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [X] 1-3,10,14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 4-9,11-13; | [XI]EP1889966 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,10,14 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 2-9,11-13 | by applicant | US4207683 | WO9632607 | EP1026306 |