EP2456429 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF RETARDING AND AMELIORATING PHOTO INDUCED RETINAL DAMAGE AND CATARACTS WHILE AMELIORATING DRY EYE SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.S. Nutraceuticals LLC dba Valensa International 2751 Nutra Lane Eustis, FL 32726 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINATELLI, John 2751 Nutra Lane Eustis Florida 32726 / US | 02 /
HILL, Stephen 140 SE 34th St. Ocala Florida 34471 / US | 03 /
MEORCK, Rudi 564 Bent Pine Court Sanford Florida 32771 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10738096.6 | 22.07.2010 | WO2010US42913 | Priority number, date | US20090227881P | 23.07.2009 Original published format: US 227881 P | US20100840396 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 840396 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011607 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456429 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/047, A61K31/122, A61K31/202, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P27/10, A61P27/12 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/047 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/10 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERZÖGERUNG UND LINDERUNG VON LICHTINDUZIERTEN NETZHAUTSCHÄDEN UND KATARAKTEN BEI LINDERUNG DES TROCKENEN-AUGE-SYNDROMS | [2012/22] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF RETARDING AND AMELIORATING PHOTO INDUCED RETINAL DAMAGE AND CATARACTS WHILE AMELIORATING DRY EYE SYNDROME | [2012/22] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETARDEMENT ET D'AMÉLIORATION DES LÉSIONS RÉTINIENNES INDUITES PAR LA LUMIÈRE ET DES CATARACTES TOUT EN AMÉLIORANT LE SYNDROME DE L' IL SEC | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 30.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6716447 (LANG JOHN C [US]) [Y] 1-11,13-29 * column 8; examples 4,5 * * column 13, line 36 - line 50 * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 *; | [Y]JP2008271878 (WAKASA SEIKATSU KK) [Y] 12,30-34 * page 6, paragraph 45 * * page 5, paragraph 36 * * page 4, paragraph 28 *; | [AD]US5527533 (TSO MARK O M [US], et al) [AD] 1-34 * column 15, line 23 - line 60 *; | [A]US2007141170 (LANG JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,13,14,16-18,20,25,29,34 * page 5, paragraph 42 * * page 8 - page 11; examples 1-11 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 20 *; | [A]WO2007062274 (U S NUTRACEUTICALS LLC DBA VAL [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,13,14,16-18,20,25,29 * page 10, paragraph 49 * * page 5, paragraph 15 *; | [A]EP1932521 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,13,14,16-18,20,25,29,31 * page 2, line 25 - line 36 * * page 7; claims 9,10 * | [Y] - Barbara Anan Kogan, "Krill oil a potential ocular anti-inflammatory", (20060601), Primary care optometry news symposium, URL: http://s129638273.onlinehome.us/pharmanexmd/Files/2006-06-01-PrimaryCareOptometryNewsKrillOil.pdf, (20101006), XP002603663 [Y] 1-34 * page 1 * | [Y] - Deborah Mitchell, "Krill oil: better than fish oil", (20090628), URL: http://www.examiner.com/alternative-medicine-in-phoenix/krill-oil-better-than-fish-oil, (20101006), XP002603664 [Y] 1-34 * page 1 * | Examination | - DR RUDIE MOERCK, "Astaxanthin & Key Carotenoids: Creating Leading Edge Eye Healthcare Formulations", (20091120), pages 1 - 35, URL: http://www.valensa.com/images/ZanthinVitaFoodsNew.pdf, (20161025), XP055313626 | by applicant | US5533527 | US5527533 | - M. O. M. TSO, "Experiments on Visual Cells by Nature and Man: In Search of Treatment for Photoreceptor Degeneration", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE, (198912), vol. 30, no. 12, pages 2421 - 2454 | - M. O. M. TSO, "Pathogenetic Factors of Aging Macular Degeneration", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 628 - 635 | - M. MATHEWS-ROTH, "Recent Progress in the Medical Applications of Carotenoids", PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 147 - 156 | - W. MIKI, "Biological Functions and Activities of Animal Carotenoids", PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 141 - 146 | - M. MATHEWS-ROTH, "Carotenoids and Cancer Prevention-Experimental and Epidemiological Studies", PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 57, no. 5, pages 717 - 722 | - M. MATHEWS-ROTH, "Porphyrin Photosensitization and Carotenoid Protection in Mice; In Vitro and In Vivo Studies", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1984), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 63 - 67 | - P. DIMASCIO ET AL., "Carotenoids, Tocopherols and Thiols as Biological Singlet Molecular Oxygen Quenchers", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (1990), vol. 18, pages 1054 - 1056, XP002082075 | - T. HIRAMITSU ET AL., "Preventative Effect of Antioxidants on Lipid Peroxidation in the Retina", OPHTHALMIC RES., (1991), vol. 23, pages 196 - 203 | - D. YU ET AL., "Amelioration of Retinal Photic Injury by Beta-Carotene", ARVO ABSTRACTS INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1987), vol. 28, page 7, XP000563632 | - M. KURASHIGE ET AL., "Inhibition of Oxidative Injury of Biological Membranes by Astaxanthin", PHYSIOL. CHEM. PHYS. AND MED. NMR, (1990), vol. 22, pages 27 - 38, XP000563607 | - N. I. KRINSKY ET AL., "Interaction of Oxygen and Oxy-radicals With Carotenoids", J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1982), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 205 - 210 | - JOHNSON, E. A. ET AL., "Simple Method for the Isolation of Astaxanthin from the Basidomycetous Yeast Phaffia rhodozyma", APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1978), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 1155 - 1159, XP008026079 | - KIRSCHFELD, K., "Carotenoid Pigments: Their Possible Role in Protecting Against Photooxidation in Eyes and Photoreceptor Cells", PROC. R. SOC. LOND., (1982), vol. 216, pages 71 - 85, XP000563682 | - LI, Z. ET AL., "Desferrioxime Ameliorated Retinal Photic Injury in Albino Rats", CURRENT EYE RES., (1991), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 133 - 144 | - MATHEWS-ROTH, M., "Porphyrin Photosensitization and Carotenoid Protection in Mice; In Vitro and In Vivo Studies", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1984), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 63 - 67 | - MICHON, J. J. ET AL., "A Comparative Study of Methods of Photoreceptor Morphometry", INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1991), vol. 32, pages 280 - 284 | - TSO, M.O.M., "Pathogenetic Factors of Aging Mascular Degeneration", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 628 - 635 | - YU, D. ET AL., "Amelioration of Retinal Photic Injury by Beta-Carotene", ARVO ABSTRACTS INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1987), vol. 28, page 7, XP000563632 | - "Dry Eye Workshop (DEWS) Committee. 2007 Report of the Dry Eye Workshop (DEWS)", OCUL SURF., (200704), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 65 - 204 | - BEHRENS A; DOYLE JJ; STERN L ET AL., "Dysfunctional tear syndrome: a Delphi approach to treatment recommendations", CORNEA., (200609), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 900 - 7 | - BRON AJ; TIFFANY JM; GOUVEIA SM ET AL., "Functional aspects of the tear film lipid layer", EXP EYE RES., (200403), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 347 - 60 | - GEERLING G; MACLENNAN S; HARTWIG D., "Autologous serum eye drops for ocular surface disorders", BR J OPHTHALMOL., (200411), vol. 88, no. 11, pages 1467 - 74 | - KARADAYI K; CIFTCI F; AKIN T ET AL., "Increase in central corneal thickness in dry and normal eyes with application of artificial tears: a new diagnostic and follow-up criterion for dry eye", OPHTHALMIC PHYSIOL OPT., (200511), vol. 25, no. 6, pages 485 - 91 | - MCCULLEY JP; SHINE WE., "The lipid layer of tears: dependent on meibomian gland function", EXP EYE RES., (200403), vol. 78, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-4835(03)00203-3, pages 361 - 5, XP002435298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-4835(03)00203-3 | - MURUBE J; NEMETH J; HOH H ET AL., "The triple classification of dry eye for practical clinical use", EUR J OPHTHALMOL., (200511), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 660 - 7 | - OHASHI Y; DOGRU M; TSUBOTA K., "Laboratory findings in tear fluid analysis", CLIN CHIM ACTA., (20060715), vol. 369, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cca.2005.12.035, pages 17 - 28, XP025058668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2005.12.035 | - PFLUGFELDER SC., "Advances in the diagnosis and management of keratoconjunctivitis sicca", CURR OPIN OPHTHALMOL., (199808), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 50 - 3 | - STERN ME; GAO J; SIEMASKO KF ET AL., "The role of the lacrimal functional unit in the pathophysiology of dry eye", EXP EYE RES., (200403), vol. 78, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exer.2003.09.003, pages 409 - 16, XP009108481 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2003.09.003 | - YOON KC; HEO H; IM SK ET AL., "Comparison of autologous serum and umbilical cord serum eye drops for dry eye syndrome", AM J OPHTHALMOL., (200707), vol. 144, no. 1, pages 86 - 92 | - ZOUKHRI D., "Effect of inflammation on lacrimal gland function", EXP EYE RES., (200605), vol. 82, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exer.2005.10.018, pages 885 - 98, XP024945408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2005.10.018 | - "TAP study group. Photodynamic therapy of subfoveal choroidal neovascularization in age-related macular degeneration with verteporfin. One-year results of 2 randomized clinical trials - TAP report 1", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (1999), vol. 117, pages 1329 - 1345 | - MICHELS S; ROSENFELD PJ., "Treatment of neovascular age-related macular degeneration with Ranibizumab/Lucentis", KLIN MONATSBL AUGENHEILKD, (2005), vol. 222, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1055/s-2005-858315, pages 480 - 484, XP009078844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2005-858315 | - KINI MM; LEIBOWITZ HM; COLTON T ET AL., "Prevalence of senile cataract, diabetic retinopathy, senile macular degeneration, and open-angle glaucoma in the Framingham Eye Study", AM J OPHTHALMOL, (1978), vol. 85, pages 28 - 34 | - SMIDDY WE; FINE SL., "Prognosis of patients with bilateral macular drusen", OPHTHALMOL, (1984), vol. 91, pages 271 - 277 | - FRIEDMAN DS; O'COLMAIN BJ; MUNOZ B ET AL., "(Eye Disease Prevalence Research Group.) Prevalence of age-related macular degeneration in the United States", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 122, pages 564 - 572 | - "Age-Related Eye Disease Study Research Group. A randomized, placebo-controlled, clinical trial of high-dose supplementation with vitamins C and E, beta-carotene, and zinc for age-related macular degeneration and vision loss: AREDS Report No. 8", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 119, pages 1417 - 36 | - KHACHIK F; SPANGLER CJ; SMITH JC, JR.; CANFIELD LM; STECK A; PFANDER H., "Identification, quantification, and relative concentrations of carotenoids and their metabolites in human milk and serum", ANAL CHEM, (1997), vol. 69, no. 10, pages 1873 - 1881, XP002571371 | - BONE RA; LANDRUM JT; TARSIS SL., "Preliminary identification of the human macular pigment", VISION RES, (1985), vol. 25, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-6989(85)90123-3, pages 1531 - 1535, XP024312222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6989(85)90123-3 | - SANGIOVANNI JP; CHEW EY., "The role of omega-3 long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids in health and disease of the retina", PROGRESS IN RETINAL AND EYE RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/j.preteyeres.2004.06.002, pages 87 - 138, XP004647557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.preteyeres.2004.06.002 | - FLIESLER SJ; ANDERSON RE., "Chemistry and metabolism of lipids in the vertebrate retina", PROG LIPID RES, (1983), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/0163-7827(83)90004-8, pages 79 - 131, XP025221889 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0163-7827(83)90004-8 | - LITMAN BJ; MITCHELL DC., "A role for phospholipid polyunsaturation in modulating membrane protein function", LIPIDS, (1996), vol. 31, pages 193 - 7 | - LITMAN BJ; NIU SL; POLOZOVA A; MITCHELL DC., "The role of docosahexaenoic acid containing phospholipids in modulating G protein-coupled signaling pathways: Visual transduction", J MOL NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 16, no. 2-3, pages 237 - 242 | - SCHAEFER EJ; ROBINS SJ; PATTON GM ET AL., "Red blood cell membrane phosphatidylethanolamine fatty acid content in various forms of retinitis pigmentosa", J LIPID RES, (1995), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 1427 - 1433 | - HOFFMAN DR; BIRCH DG., "Docosahexaenoic acid in red blood cells of patients with X-linked retinitis pigmentosa", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (1995), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 1009 - 1018 | - HOFFMAN DR; UAUY R; BIRCH DG., "Metabolism of omega-3 fatty acids in patients with autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa", EXP EYE RES, (1995), vol. 60, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-4835(05)80110-1, pages 279 - 289, XP004914747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-4835(05)80110-1 | - MARTINEZ M; VAZQUEZ E; GARCIA-SILVA MT ET AL., "Therapeutic effects of docosahexaenoic acid ethyl ester in patients with generalized peroxisomal disorders", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 376S - 385S | - CLANDININ MT; JUMPSEN J; SUH M., "Relationship between fatty acid accretion, membrane composition, and biologic functions", J PEDIATR, (1994), vol. 125, pages 25 - 32 | - SALEM N, JR.; LITMAN B; KIM HY; GAWRISCH K., "Mechanisms of action of docosahexaenoic acid in the nervous system", LIPIDS, (2001), vol. 36, no. 9, pages 945 - 959 | - CHEN Y; HOUGHTON LA; BRENNA JT; NOY N., "Docosahexaenoic acid modulates the interactions of interphotoreceptor retinoid-binding protein with 11-cis-retinal", J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, no. 34, pages 20507 - 20515 | - DE URQUIZA, AM ET AL., "Docosahexaenoic acid, a ligand for the retinoid X receptor in mouse brain", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 290, pages 2140 - 4 | - LIN Q; RUUSKA SE; SHAW NS; DONG D; NOY N., "Ligand selectivity of the peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor alpha", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1021/bi9816094, pages 185 - 90, XP002929576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9816094 | - DREYER C ET AL., "Positive regulation of the peroxisomal beta- oxidation pathway by fatty acids through activation of peroxisome proliferator-activated receptors (PPAR)", BIOL CELL, (1993), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1016/S0248-4900(05)80176-5, pages 67 - 76, XP026914146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0248-4900(05)80176-5 | - YU K ET AL., "Differential activation of peroxisome proliferator-activated receptors by eicosanoids", J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.270.41.23975, pages 23975 - 83, XP000615426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.41.23975 | - POLITI LE; ROTSTEIN NP; CARRI NG., "Effect of GDNF on neuroblast proliferation and photoreceptor survival: additive protection with docosahexaenoic acid", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2001), vol. 42, no. 12, pages 3008 - 3015 | - ROTSTEIN NP; AVELDANO ML; BARRANTES FJ; ROCCAMO AM; POLITI LE., "Apoptosis of retinal photoreceptors during development in vitro: protective effect of docosahexaenoic acid", J NEUROCHEM, (1997), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 504 - 513 | - ROTSTEIN NP; POLITI LE; AVELDANO MI., "Docosahexaenoic acid promotes differentiation of developing photoreceptors in culture", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (1998), vol. 39, no. 13, pages 2750 - 2758 | - ROTSTEIN NP; AVELDANO MI; BARRANTES FJ; POLITI LE., "Docosahexaenoic acid is required for the survival of rat retinal photoreceptors in vitro", J NEUROCHEM, (1996), vol. 66, no. 5, pages 1851 - 1859 | - KIM HY; AKBAR M; KIM KY., "Inhibition of neuronal apoptosis by polyunsaturated fatty acids", J MOL NEUROSCI, (2001), vol. 16, no. 2-3, pages 223279 - 227284 | - DIEP QN; AMIRI F; YOUYZ RM ET AL., "PPARalpha activator effects on Ang II-induced vascular oxidative stress and inflammation", HYPERTENSION, (2002), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 866 - 871 | - YANG SP; MORITA I; MUROTA SI, "Eicosapentaenoic acid attenuates vascular endothelial growth factor-induced proliferation via inhibiting Flk-1 receptor expression in bovine carotid artery endothelial cells", J CELL PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 176, no. 2, pages 342 - 349 | - VON KNETHEN A; CALLSEN D; BRUNE B., "Superoxide attenuates macrophage apoptosis by NF-kappa B and AP-1 activation that promotes cyclooxygenase-2 expression", J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 163, no. 5, pages 2858 - 2866 | - MORITA I; ZHANG YW; MUROTA SI, "Eicosapentaenoic acid protects endothelial cell function injured by hypoxia/reoxygenation", ANN N YACAD SCI, (2001), vol. 947, pages 394 - 397 | - CALDER PC., "Polyunsaturated fatty acids, inflammation, and immunity", LIPIDS, (2001), vol. 36, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1007/s11745-001-0812-7, pages 1007 - 1024, XP008053372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-001-0812-7 | - ROSE DP; CONNOLLY JM; RAYBURN J; COLEMAN M., "Influence of diets containing eicosapentaenoic or docosahexaenoic acid on growth and metastasis of breast cancer cells in nude mice", J NATL CANCER INST, (1995), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 587 - 592 | - ROSE DP; CONNOLLY JM., "Antiangiogenicity of docosahexaenoic acid and its role in the suppression of breast cancer cell growth in nude mice", NT J ONCOL, (1999), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1011 - 1015, XP001037791 | - BADAWI AF; EI-SOHEMY A; STEPHEN LL; GHOSHAL AK; ARCHER MC., "The effect of dietary n-3 and n-6 polyunsaturated fatty acids on the expression of cyclooxygenase 1 and 2 and levels of p21 as in rat mammary glands", CARCINOGENESIS, (1998), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 905 - 910 | - HAMID R; SINGH J; REDDY BS; COHEN LA., "Inhibition of dietary menhaden oil of cyclooxygenase-1 and -2 in N-nitrosomethyiurea-induced rat mammary tumors", NT J ONCOL, (1999), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 523 - 528 | - RINGBOM T; HUSS U; STENHOLM A ET AL., "Cox-2 inhibitory effects of naturally occurring and modified fatty acids", J NAT PROD, (2001), vol. 64, no. 6, pages 745 - 749 | - KANAYASU T; MORITA I; NAKAO-HAYASHI J ET AL., "Eicosapentaenoic acid inhibits tube formation of vascular endothelial cells in vitro", LIPIDS, (1991), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/BF02537136, pages 271 - 276, XP035174030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02537136 | - FARRARA N; DAVIS-SMYTH T., "The biology of vascular endothelial growth factor", ENDOCRREV, (1997), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 4 - 25 | - MARES-PERLMAN JA; BRADY WE; KLEIN R; VANDENLANGENBERG GM; KLEIN BE; PLATA M., "Dietary fat and age-related maculopathy", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (1995), vol. 113, no. 6, pages 743 - 8 | - HEUBERGER RA; MARES-PERLMAN JA; KLEIN R; KLEIN BE; MILLEN AE; PALTA M., "Relationship of dietary fat to age-related maculopathy in the Third National Health and Nutrition Examination Survey", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 119, no. 12, pages 1833 - 8 | - SMITH W; MITCHELL P; LEEDER SR., "Dietary fat and fish intake and age-related maculopathy", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2000), vol. 118, no. 3, pages 401 - 4 | - SEDDON JM; ROSNER B; SPERDUTO RD; YANNUZZI L; HALLER JA; BLAIR NP; WILLETT W., "Dietary fat and risk for advanced age-related macular degeneration", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2001), vol. 119, no. 8, pages 1191 - 9 | - SEDDON JM; COTE J; ROSNER B., "Progression of age-related macular degeneration: Association with dietary fat, transunsaturated fat, nuts, and fish intake", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 121, no. 12, pages 1728 - 1737 | - SEDDON JM; AJANI UA; SPERDUTO RD ET AL., "Dietary carotenoids, vitamins A, C and E, and advanced age-related macular degeneration. Eye Disease Case-Control Study Group", JAMA, (1994), vol. 272, no. 18, pages 1413 - 20 | - SNELLEN EL; VERBEEK AL; VAN DEN HOOGEN GW; CRUYSBERG JR; HOYNG CB., "Neovascular age-related macular degeneration and its relationship to antioxidant intake", ACTA OPHTHALMOL SCAND, (2002), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 368 - 71 | - MARES-PERLMAN JA; FISHER AI; KLEIN R ET AL., "Lutein and zeaxanthin in the diet and serum and their relation to age-related maculopathy in the Third National Health and Nutrition Examination Survey", AM J EPIDEMIOL, (2001), vol. 153, no. 5, pages 424 - 32 | - MARES-PERLMAN JA; KLEIN R; KLEIN BE ET AL., "Association of zinc and antioxidant nutrients with age-related maculopathy", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (1996), vol. 114, no. 8, pages 991 - 7 | - CHO E; SEDDON JM; ROSNER B; WILLETT WC; HANKINSON SE, "Prospective study of intake of fruits, vegetables, vitamins, carotenoids and risk of age-related maculopathy", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (2004), vol. 122, no. 6, pages 883 - 892 | - LAN KKG; LACHIN JM., "Implementation of group sequential logrank tests in a maximum duration trial", BIOMETRICS, (1990), vol. 46, pages 759 - 770 | - LAN KKG; DEMETS DL., "Discrete sequential boundaries for clinical trials", BIOMETRIKA, (1983), vol. 70, pages 659 - 663 | - O'BRIEN PC; FLEMING TR., "A multiple testing procedure for clinical trials", BIOMETRICS, (1979), vol. 35, pages 549 - 556 | - LIANG KY; ZEGER SL., "Longitudinal data analysis using generalized linear models", BIOMETFIKA, (1986), vol. 73, pages 13 - 22 | - MILLER ER; PASTOR-BARRIUSO R; DARSHAN D; RIEMERSMA RA; APPEL LJ; GUALLAR E., "Meta-analysis: high-dosage vitamin E supplementation may increase all- cause mortality", ANN INTERN MED., (2005), vol. 143, pages 37 - 46 | - DEUTSCH ET AL., "Evaluation of the effects of Neptune krill oil on chronic inflammation and arthritis symptoms", JOUMAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF NUTRITION, (2007), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 39 - 48 | - BUNEA ET AL., "Evaluation of the effects of Neptune krill oil on the clinical course of hyperlipidemia", ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE REVIEW, (2004), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 420 - 428 | - HU ET AL., "Types of dietary fat and risk of coronary heart disease: A critical review", J. AM. COLL. NUTRITION, (2001), vol. 20, pages 5 - 19 | - KRIS-ETHERTON ET AL., CURR. ATHEROSCLER. REPORT, (2008), vol. 10, pages 503 - 509 | - LEAF ET AL., "Prevention of sudden death by omega-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids", PHARMACOL. THERAPY, (2003), vol. 98, pages 355 - 77 | - MAKI ET AL., "Krill oil supplementation increases plasma concentrations of eicosapentaenoic and docosahexaenoic acids in overweight and obese men and women", NUTRITION RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nutres.2009.09.004, pages 609 - 15, XP026705847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nutres.2009.09.004 | - MASSRIEH, W., "Health benefits of omega-3 fatty acids from Neptune Krill oil", LIPID TECHNOLOGY, (200805), vol. 20, no. 5 | - AWASTHI N; GUO S; WAGNER BJ., "Posterior capsular opacification: a problem reduced but not yet eradicated", ARCH OPHTHALMOL., (200904), vol. 127, no. 4, pages 555 - 62 | - BELL CM; HATCH WV; FISCHER HD; CERNAT G; PATERSON JM; GRUNEIR A ET AL., "Association between tamsulosin and serious ophthalmic adverse events in older men following cataract surgery", JAMA, (20090520), vol. 301, no. 19, pages 1991 - 6 | - MARAINI G; SPERDUTO RD; FERRIS F; CLEMONS TE; ROSMINI F ET AL., "A randomized, double-masked, placebo-controlled clinical trial of multivitamin supplementation for age-related lens opacities. Clinical trial of nutritional supplements and age-related cataract report no. 3", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (200804), vol. 115, no. 4, pages 599 - 607.E1 | - FERNANDEZ MM; AFSHARI NA., "Nutrition and the prevention of cataracts", CURR OPIN OPHTHALMOL., (200801), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 66 - 70 | - FRIEDMAN AH., "Tamsulosin and the intraoperative floppy iris syndrome", JAMA, (20090520), vol. 301, no. 19, pages 2044 - 5 | - GUERCIO JR; MARTYN LJ., "Congenital malformations of the eye and orbit.", OTOLARYNGOL CLIN NORTH AM., (200702), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 113VII - 40 | - LONG V; CHEN S; HATT S., "Surgical interventions for bilateral congenital cataract", COCHRANE DATABASE SYST REV., (20060719), vol. 3 | - MOELLER SM; VOLAND R; TINKER L; BLODI BA; KLEIN ML; GEHRS KM ET AL., "Associations between age-related nuclear cataract and lutein and zeaxanthin inthe diet and serum in the Carotenoids in the Age-Related Eye Disease Study, an Ancillary Study of the Women's Health Initiative", ARCH OPHTHALMOL., (200803), vol. 126, no. 3, pages 354 - 64 | - WISHART MS; DAGRES E., "Seven-year follow-up of combined cataract extraction and viscocanalostomy", J CATARACT REFRACT SURG., (200612), vol. 32, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jcrs.2006.08.035, pages 2043 - 9, XP024965464 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrs.2006.08.035 |