EP2395308 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Tomoichiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KOMORI, Kou c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Fritsche, Rainer Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10738301.0 | 19.01.2010 | [2018/43] | WO2010JP00267 | Priority number, date | JP20090024653 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009024653 | [2011/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089957 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395308 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2395308 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/00, F28D7/04, F28F1/40, F28F1/42, F28F13/12 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
F28D7/0016 (EP,US);
F24H4/04 (EP,US);
F28F1/426 (EP,US);
F28F13/12 (EP,US);
F24D2200/123 (EP,US);
F28F2270/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | F28D7/00, F28D7/04, F28F1/40, F28F1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2011/50] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [2011/50] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | Translation filed | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | IE | 19.01.2019 | LU | 19.01.2019 | MT | 19.01.2019 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GB | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
MT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
MT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
MT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2003148880 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [X] 1,13-16 * figures 3,8 * [Y] 2-12 [I] 2,3; | [I]JP2004340455 (TAIHEIYO SEIKO KK) [I] 1-11,13-16 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2007326141 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 10-12* the whole document *; | [I]JP2008082669 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1-16 * figures 9-11 *; | [Y]JP2008188599 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2-9 * figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]JPS54128041 (TATSUMI HITOSHI); | [Y]JPH03279788 (HITACHI CABLE); | [Y]JPH0639463 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2004226036 (TOSHIBA CARRIER KK, et al); | [Y]JP2005221094 (IWAI KIKAI KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2005233479 (TOKYO RADIATOR SEIZO KK); | [Y]JP2006162204 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]WO2006103788 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al); | [Y]JP2007326141 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO2008029639 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al); | [A]JP2008188599 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006162204 |