EP2395465 - VENDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blank, Pol Emanuilovich Ul. 8 Marta 15a-36 Moscow 125319 / RU | For all designated states Blank, Emanuil Ihilovich Ul. 8 Marta 15a-36 Moscow 125319 / RU | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A 38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 10738797.9 | 11.01.2010 | WO2010RU00005 | Priority number, date | RU20090103447 | 03.02.2009 Original published format: RU 2009103447 | [2011/50] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010090549 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2395465 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q10/08, G06Q30/06 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G07F9/002 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
G07F7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | VERKAUFSSYSTEM | [2011/50] | English: | VENDING SYSTEM | [2011/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMERCE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | Translation filed | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6182857 (HAMM DOUG A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3 - column 5 * * column 17 - column 18 * * figures 1,7 *; | [X]US2004128025 (DEAL STEVEN A [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2006180654 (MEEK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0074] *; | [L]WO9628279 (L & P PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO [US]) [L] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]RU2155990 (L & AMP P PROPERTI MENEDZHMENT [US]); | [Y]US5215412 (ROGOFF ERIC A [US], et al); | [Y]RU2171495 (VOLIK ALEKSANDR JUR EVICH, et al); | [Y]US2006250237 (WHITTEN STEPHEN [US], et al); | [Y]RU2196977 (YUKI ENGINEERING SYSTEM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO03085613 (IGT RENO NEV [US], et al) | by applicant | RU2155990 | RU2265246 | RU2273198 | RU2278412 | RU2192041 | RU20020113298 |