EP2394057 - PERISTALTIC PUMP TUBING WITH STOPPER AND COOPERATIVE ROLLER ASSEMBLY HOUSING HAVING NO MOVING PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klein, Jeffrey, A. 30280 Ranch Viejo Road San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Tersteegen, Felix, et al Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Tersteegen, Felix, et al Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10738984.3 | 28.01.2010 | WO2010US22393 | Priority number, date | US20090150997P | 09.02.2009 Original published format: US 150997 P | US20090539984 | 12.08.2009 Original published format: US 539984 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090944 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394057 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
F04B43/1261 (EP,US);
F04B43/1223 (US);
F04B43/1238 (US);
F04B43/1253 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCH FÜR EINE PERISTALTISCHE PUMPE MIT ANSCHLAG UND DAMIT ZUSAMMENWIRKENDES ROLLENANORDNUNGSGEHÄUSE OHNE SICH BEWEGENDE TEILE | [2011/50] | English: | PERISTALTIC PUMP TUBING WITH STOPPER AND COOPERATIVE ROLLER ASSEMBLY HOUSING HAVING NO MOVING PARTS | [2011/50] | French: | TUBE DE POMPE PÉRISTALTIQUE AVEC BOUCHON ET BOÎTIER D'ENSEMBLE ROULEAU COOPÉRATIF NE COMPORTANT AUCUNE PIÈCE MOBILE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4767289 (PARROTT PATTI L [US], et al); | [Y]US5057081 (SUNDERLAND RICHARD A [US], et al); | [Y]US5088522 (RATH DIETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US5342182 (MONTOYA JEAN P [US], et al) |