EP2394224 - TELEVISION-BASED ADVERTISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF TV WIDGETS FOR THE CELL PHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digimarc Corporation 9405 S.W. Gemini Drive Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ, Tony, F. 4436 SW Eleanor Lane Portland OR 97221 / US | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10738985.0 | 28.01.2010 | WO2010US22423 | Priority number, date | US20090150235P | 05.02.2009 Original published format: US 150235 P | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010090946 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394224 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8186 (KR,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04L67/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/53 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/724 (US);
H04N21/4126 (KR);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/44227 (US);
H04N21/478 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4821 (US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8173 (US);
H04N21/858 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | WERBUNG AUF FERNSEHBASIS UND AUSGABE VON FERNSEHAPPLIKATIONEN FÜR MOBILTELEFONE | [2011/50] | English: | TELEVISION-BASED ADVERTISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF TV WIDGETS FOR THE CELL PHONE | [2011/50] | French: | PUBLICITÉ BASÉE SUR LA TÉLÉVISION ET DISTRIBUTION DE WIDGETS TV POUR TÉLÉPHONE PORTABLE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002162118 (LEVY KENNETH L [US], et al); | [X]US2007050054 (SAMBANDAM GURUPARAN GURU C [US], et al); | [Y]US2007107016 (ANGEL ALBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US2007107021 (ANGEL ALBERT J [US], et al); | [X]US2007250194 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US], et al); | [Y]US2008276279 (GOSSWEILER RICHARD C [US], et al) |