EP2448689 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BENDING A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trumpf Maschinen Austria GmbH & Co. KG. Industriepark 24 4061 Pasching / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Trumpf Maschinen Austria GmbH & CO. KG. Industriepark 24 4061 Pasching / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMMER, Ferdinand Herbeckstrasse 83/16 A-1170 Wien / AT | 02 /
SCHUÖCKER, Dieter Oskar-Jascha-Gasse 58 A-1130 Wien / AT | 03 /
RAU, Armin Wiesenweg 18 A-4501 Neuhofen / AT | 04 /
AICHINGER, Joachim Ansfeldnerstrasse 42 A-4052 Ansfelden / AT | 05 /
SPERRER, Gerhard Schmiedberg 20 A-4554 Oberschlierbach / AT | 06 /
SCHUMI, Thomas Bräuhausgasse 11/42 A-1050 Wien / AT | [2014/49] |
Former [2012/19] | 01 /
BAMMER, Ferdinand Herbeckstrasse 83/16 A-1170 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
SCHUÖCKER, Dieter Oskar-Jascha-Gasse 58 A-1130 Wien / AT | |||
03 /
RAU, Armin Wiesenweg 18 A-4501 Neuhofen / AT | |||
04 /
AICHINGER, Joachim Ansfeldnerstrasse 42 A-4052 Ansfelden / AT | |||
05 /
SPERRER, Gerhard Oberschlierbach 21 A-4553 Oberschlierbach / AT | |||
06 /
SCHUMI, Thomas Bräuhausgasse 11/42 A-1050 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2015/09] |
Former [2012/19] | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 10739461.1 | 29.06.2010 | WO2010AT00237 | Priority number, date | AT20090001008 | 29.06.2009 Original published format: AT 10082009 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000013 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448689 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448689 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/02, B21D37/16 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B21D5/0209 (EP,US);
B21D37/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BIEGEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2012/19] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BENDING A WORKPIECE | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE D'UNE PIÈCE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 09.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2010 | AL | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | AT | 29.06.2015 | GB | 29.06.2015 | IE | 29.06.2015 | LU | 29.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 29.06.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.06.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.06.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 29.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
GB | 29.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | DK | 25.02.2015 | |
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0933345 (UOP INC [US], et al) [A] 1,19,20 * paragraph [0020]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]AT411023B (INST SPANLOSE FERTIGUNG UND HO [AT]) [A] 1,19,20 * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 38; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19514285 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0108718 (CYBELEC SA [CH]) [A] 1,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1961502 (BYSTRONIC LASER AG [CH]) [A] 1,19,20 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0993345 |