EP2456557 - FEED BAG CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2018/22] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica MA 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Dennis c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 02 /
NOUKAS, Elias c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 03 /
PRESCOTT, Kristin c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 04 /
PEREIRA, Brian c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 05 /
SARAGOSA, John 78 Walton Park Melrose, MA 02176 / US | [2014/13] |
Former [2013/08] | 01 /
WONG, Dennis c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | ||
02 /
NOUKAS, Elias c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | |||
03 /
PRESCOTT, Kristin c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | |||
04 /
PEREIRA, Brian c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | |||
05 /
SARAGOSA, John 78 Walton Park Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
Former [2012/22] | 01 /
WONG, Dennis c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | ||
02 /
NOUKAS, Elias c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | |||
03 /
PRESCOTT, Kristin c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | |||
04 /
PEREIRA, Brian c/o Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01803 / US | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2020/11] |
Former [2014/46] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/22] | Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road GB-Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10739723.4 | 18.06.2010 | [2020/11] | WO2010US01768 | Priority number, date | US20090283930P | 09.12.2009 Original published format: US 283930 P | US20090271667P | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 271667 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011011035 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2456557 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2456557 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, C12M1/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/523 (EP,US);
B65D33/00 (US);
C12M99/00 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2200/087 (EP,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | B01L3/00, B65D75/58, A61J1/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION EINES ZUFUHRBEUTELS | [2012/22] | English: | FEED BAG CONSTRUCTION | [2012/22] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SAC D'ALIMENTATION | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2010 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | LU | 18.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3945534 (ADY ESTHMEL W) [A] 1-5,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9003775 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5078699 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [A] 1-5,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4403755 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-5,15,16 * abstract * * column 6, line 60 - column 14, line 19; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US5941635 (STEWART DOYLE W [US]) [X] 6-14,17,18 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 6, line 67 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2003080140 (NEAS EDWIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-5,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0023] - [0035] - [0036]; figure 6; claim 1 *; | [XA]US2003198406 (BIBBO KENNETH L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0172] - [0179] - [0191] - [0194]; figures 20, 21A, 21B,24 * [A] 6-14,17,18; | [A]EP1602715 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [A] 6-14,17,18* the whole document * | by applicant | US5941635 | US2003080140 | US2003198406 |