EP2460160 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PLASMA COMPRESSION WITH RECYCLING OF PROJECTILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Fusion, Inc. 108-3680 Bonneville Place Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 4T5 / CA | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWARD, Stephen, James 104-9145 Saturna Drive Burnaby BC V3J 7K1 / CA | 02 /
RICHARDSON, Douglas, Harvey 2305 East Road Anmore. BC V3H 5G9 / CA | 03 /
GREGSON, James 108-3680 Bonneville Place Burnaby, BC V3 4T5 / CA | 04 /
LABERGE, Michel, Georges 5925 Falcon Road West Vancouver British Columbia V7W 1W5 / CA | 05 /
MCILWRAITH, Lon 11115 Southridge Road Delta, BC V4E 2M3 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/22] | 01 /
HOWARD, Stephen, James 104-9145 Saturna Drive Burnaby BC V3J 7K1 / CA | ||
02 /
RICHARSON, Douglas, Harvey 2305 East Road Anmore. BC V3H 5G9 / CA | |||
03 /
GREGSON, James 108-3680 Bonneville Place Burnaby, BC V3 4T5 / CA | |||
04 /
LABERGE, Michel, Georges 5925 Falcon Road West Vancouver British Columbia V7W 1W5 / CA | |||
05 /
MCILWRAITH, Lon 11115 Southridge Road Delta, BC V4E 2M3 / CA | |||
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
HOWARD, Stephen, James 941 Blackstock Road Port Moody BC V3H 3S3 / CA | ||
02 /
RICHARDON, Douglas, Harvey 2305 East Road Anmore. BC V3H 5G9 / CA | |||
03 /
GREGSON, James 108-3680 Bonneville Place Burnaby, BC V3 4T5 / CA | |||
04 /
LABERGE, Michel, Georges 5925 Falcon Road West Vancouver British Columbia V7W 1W5 / CA | |||
05 /
MCILWRAITH, Lon 108-3680 Bonneville Place Burnaby, BC V3N 4T5 / CA | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/23] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston GB-Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10740096.2 | 28.07.2010 | WO2010US43587 | Priority number, date | US20090229355P | 29.07.2009 Original published format: US 229355 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011014577 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460160 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2460160 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2460160 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21B3/00, H05H1/02, H05H1/54 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
H05H1/02 (EP,KR,US);
G21B3/00 (KR);
G21B3/006 (EP,US);
G21B3/008 (EP);
H05H1/54 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PLASMAKOMPRESSION MIT GESCHOSS-RECYCLING | [2012/50] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PLASMA COMPRESSION WITH RECYCLING OF PROJECTILES | [2012/23] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMPRESSION DE PLASMA AVEC RECYCLAGE DES PROJECTILES | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/23] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR PLASMAKOMPRESSION MIT GESCHOSS-RECYCLING | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 09.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2010 | AL | 05.06.2013 | AT | 05.06.2013 | BE | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | IT | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | IE | 28.07.2013 | LU | 28.07.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.07.2010 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
LU | 28.07.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.07.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
IT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
BE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4290848 (SUDAN RAVINDRA N) [A] 1,2,4,5,16,18,24,26,29,38 * column 2, line 35 - line 57 * * figure . *; | [AD]US4328070 (WINTERBERG FRIEDWARDT M) [AD] 1,24 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4435354 (WINTERBERG F [US]) [AD] 1,24 * figure - * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 66 *; | [AD]US2006198483 (LABERGE MICHEL G [CA]) [AD] 1,24 * the whole document *; | [AD] - HOWARD S ET AL, "Development of merged compact toroids for use as a magnetized target fusion plasma", JOURNAL OF FUSION ENERGY SPRINGER NEW YORK USA, (20081111), vol. 28, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10894-008-9167-9, ISSN 0164-0313, pages 156 - 161, XP002604406 [AD] 1-7,24-26,32-34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S10894-008-9167-9 | [A] - PETERKIN R E JR, "Direct electromagnetic acceleration of a compact toroid to high density and high speed", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, USA, (19950417), vol. 74, no. 16, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 3165 - 3168+ 2PP, XP002604407 [A] 1-6,24-26 * page 3165, column l, paragraph 2 * | [AD] - HARTMAN C W ET AL, "A compact torus fusion reactor utilizing a continuously generated string of CT's. The CT string reactor, CTSR", JOURNAL OF FUSION ENERGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC/PLENUM PUBLISHERS, USA, (20071102), vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10894-007-9098-X, ISSN 0164-0313, pages 44 - 48, XP002604408 [AD] 1-6 * page 44, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S10894-007-9098-X | by applicant | US4328070 | US4435354 | US4534263 | US4687045 | US5429030 | US2006198483 | US2006198486 | - C. W. HARTMAN ET AL., "A Compact Torus Fusion Reactor Utilizing a Continuously Generated String ofCT's. The CT String Reactor", CTSR JOURNAL OF FUSION ENERGY, (2008), vol. 27, pages 44 - 48 | - HOWARD S ET AL., "Development of merged compact toroids for use as a magnetized target fusion plasma", JOURNAL OF FUSION ENERGY, (200811), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 156 - 161 | - J. H. DEGNAN ET AL., "Compact toroid formation, compression, and acceleration", PHYS. FLUIDS B, (1993), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 2938 - 2958 | - R. E. PETERKIN, "Direct electromagnetic acceleration of a compact toroid to high density and high speed", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1995), vol. 74, no. 6, pages 3165 - 3170 | - J. H. HAMMER ET AL., "Experimental demonstration of acceleration and focusing of magnetically confined plasma rings", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (198812), vol. 61, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.61.2843, pages 2843 - 2846, XP002696675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.61.2843 | - H. S. MCLEAN ET AL., "Design and operation of a passively switched repetitive compact toroid plasma accelerator", FUSION TECHNOLOGY, (199805), vol. 33, pages 252 - 272 |