EP2459555 - PROCESSES FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF RIVAROXABAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRKA, D.D., Novo Mesto Smarjeska cesta 6 8501 Novo mesto / SI | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUPANCIC, Silvo Zupnca 4b SI-8000 NOVO MESTO / SI | 02 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 SI-8000 NOVO MESTO / SI | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/44] |
Former [2012/23] | Westendorp | Sommer Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10740170.5 | 30.07.2010 | [2021/44] | WO2010EP04688 | Priority number, date | SI20090000218 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: SI 200900218 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012321 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459555 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2459555 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14, A61K31/42, A61P7/00 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,EA);
A61K31/42 (EP,EA);
A61P7/00 (EP,EA)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | 22.02.2012 | ME | 22.02.2012 | RS | 22.02.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KRISTALLISIERUNG VON RIVAROXABAN | [2012/23] | English: | PROCESSES FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF RIVAROXABAN | [2012/23] | French: | MÉTHODES DE CRISTALLISATION DE RIVAROXABAN | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 07.11.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 03.12.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 05.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Observations by third parties | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Observations by third parties | 25.01.2021 | Observations by third parties | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2022
03.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2022/36] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 18.08.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 05.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0074/24 | 05.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 26.02.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | IT | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | NL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | TR | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | GB | 30.07.2022 | IE | 30.07.2022 | LU | 30.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | FR | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
MK | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
GB | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
GB | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
GB | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 30.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
GB | 30.07.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
LU | 30.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO0147919 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1 * example 44 * [I] 13; | [ID]WO2004060887 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [ID] 13 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO2007039132 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-5,14 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 11 * * page 2, line 26 - line 33 *; | [X]WO2009074249 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 13 * page 6, line 19 - page 9, line 16; example 1 *; | [XD] - ROEHRIG S ET AL, "Discovery of the Novel Antithrombotic Agent 5-Chloro-N-(((5S)-2-oxo-3 [4-(3-oxomorpholin-4-yl)phenyl]-1,3-oxazolidin-5-yl)methyl)thiophene 2-carboxamide (BAY 59-7939): An Oral, Direct Factor Xa Inhibitor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM050101D, (20050922), vol. 48, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5900 - 5908, XP002418821 [XD] 1 * page 5903, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm050101d | by applicant | WO0147919 | DE10129725 | WO2004060887 | WO2005068456 | WO2007039132 | - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 48, pages 5900 - 5908 | other | US2005182055 | WO2007039132 | US7351823 | WO2010075631 | US8188270 | WO0147919 | US7157456 | - "RECRYSTALLISATION TECHNIOUES", Brian S. Furniss et al, Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry. 5th ed., Longman Scientific & Technical, (19890000), pages 135 - 153, XP055580749 | - SHERRY L. MORISSETTEA, "High-throughput crystallization: polymorphs, salts, co-crystals and solvates of pharmaceutical solids", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20040000), vol. 56, pages 275 - 300, XP009072233 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2003.10.020 | - BRIAN S. FURNISS et al., Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry, (19890000), pages 135 - 153, XP055580749 | - M.GIULIETTI, "INDUSTRIAL CRYSTALLIZATION AND PRECIPITATION FROM SOLUTIONS: STATE OF THE TECHNIQUE", Braz. J. Chem. Eng., (20011200), vol. 18, no. 4, XP002563840 | - Morissette S, "High-throughput crystallization: polymorphs, salts, co-crystals and solvates of pharmaceutical solids", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20040000), vol. 56, pages 275 - 300, XP055531004 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2003.10.020 | - Brian S Furniss; Et Al, Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry. 5th ed,, Longman Scientific & Technical, (19890000), pages 135 - 142, XP055580749 | - GIULIETTI M; SECKLER M M; DERENZO S; RÉ M I; CEKINSKI E, "INDUSTRIAL CRYSTALLIZATION AND PRECIPITATION FROM SOLUTIONS: STATE OF THE TECHNIQUE", BRAZILIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING,, (20011200), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 423 - 440, XP002563840 | Opposition | WO0147919 | US2005182055 | WO2007039132 | WO2010075631 | US7351823 | WO2014020458 | - Furniss Brian, Et Al, Furniss Brian, Et Al, Vogel A. I.; Furniss B.S.; Hannaford A.J.; Smith P.W.G.; Tatchell A.R., Vogel's Textbook of Practical Organic Chemistry, Harlow , Addison Wesley Longman Limited , (19890101), pages 135 - 153, ISBN 978-0-582-46236-6, XP055950142 | - Falbe Jürgen, Manfred Regitz, "Waschen", RÖMPP CHEMIELEXIKON, T-Z, Thieme Verlag, (19920101), page 4990, XP093108201 |