EP2403783 - PLANT FOR FEEDING GROUPS OF PRODUCTS TO A PACKAGING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurosicma S.p.A. Via Arbe 27 20125 Milano / IT | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDAELLI, Marco Via Gramsci 16 I-20060 Cassina de' Pecchi / IT | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Cosenza, Simona, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 10740249.7 | 01.03.2010 | WO2010IB00417 | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00327 | 05.03.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090327 | [2012/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010100545 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2403783 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403783 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/26 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B65G17/26 (EP);
B65B23/12 (EP);
B65B35/405 (EP);
B65B35/44 (EP);
B65G47/841 (EP);
B65G2201/0205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | 31.08.2011 | BA | 31.08.2011 | ME | 31.08.2011 | RS | 31.08.2011 | Title | German: | ANLAGE FÜR DIE ZUFÜHRUNG VON PRODUKTGRUPPEN ZU EINER VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE | [2012/02] | English: | PLANT FOR FEEDING GROUPS OF PRODUCTS TO A PACKAGING MACHINE | [2012/02] | French: | INSTALLATION PERMETTANT D'ALIMENTER UNE MACHINE DE CONDITIONNEMENT EN GROUPES DE PRODUITS | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2011 | Translation filed | 31.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2010 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | SM | 11.09.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | IE | 01.03.2014 | LU | 01.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
SM | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 01.03.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0226601 (IWK VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,8,9 * pages 1-13; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO8805417 (SAPAL PLIEUSES AUTOMATIQUES [CH]) [Y] 1,3,4,8,9 * pages 1-12; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0161142 (TABACS & ALLUMETTES IND [FR]) [A] 1 * pages 1-8; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE10361572 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4 * columns 1-6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2007230751 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 8 * figures 1-11 * * Abstract *; | [A]WO2008022930 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR], et al) [A] 9 * pages 1-50; figures 1-13 * | by applicant | WO8805417 |