EP2398201 - MOBILE MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Timi Technologies Co., Ltd. F/10, Tower A Beijing NongKe Building No. 11 ShuGuangHuaYuan ZhongLu Haidian Beijing 100097 / CN | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Qihong F/10, Tower A Beijing NongKe Building No. 11 ShuGuangHuaYuan ZhongLu Haidian Beijing 100097 / CN | 02 /
TAO, Tao F/10, Tower A Beijing NongKe Building No. 11 ShuGuangHuaYuan ZhongLu Haidian Beijing 100097 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Qiusheng F/10, Tower A Beijing NongKe Building No. 11 ShuGuangHuaYuan ZhongLu Haidian Beijing 100097 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Binbin F/10, Tower A Beijing NongKe Building No. 11 ShuGuangHuaYuan ZhongLu Haidian Beijing 100097 / CN | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Davies, Philip Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2011/51] | Application number, filing date | 10740907.0 | 02.02.2010 | WO2010CN70463 | Priority number, date | CN2009178049 | 11.02.2009 Original published format: CN200910078049 | [2011/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091618 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398201 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H04L27/2607 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | MOBILES MULTIMEDIA-RUNDFUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/51] | English: | MOBILE MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2011/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE DIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA MOBILE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2011 | Translation filed | 15.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees GR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN1960357 (TIMI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD); | [Y]CN1960358 (TIMI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD); | [Y]CN101018104 (INNOFIDEI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD); | [A]CN101018223 (INNOFIDEI TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD) |