EP2446134 - SMALL ENGINE EMISSIONS CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLS, Vaughn, Kevin 14196 Fairway Drive Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | 02 /
ERDMANN, Matthew, Lorenz 7236 Richmond Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10742555.5 | 22.06.2010 | [2018/03] | WO2010IB01502 | Priority number, date | US20090488942 | 22.06.2009 Original published format: US 488942 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150073 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446134 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446134 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/20, B60K15/03, F16K24/04, B60K15/035, F02M37/00, F02M25/08 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
F02M25/0836 (EP,US);
F02M25/08 (KR);
B60K15/03519 (US);
B60K15/035 (KR);
F02M37/00 (KR);
F02M37/007 (EP,US);
F16K24/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03276 (EP,US);
F02M37/20 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3084 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3087 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | F02M25/08, B60K15/035, F02M37/00, F16K24/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASKONTROLLVENTIL FÜR KLEINMOTOREN | [2012/18] | English: | SMALL ENGINE EMISSIONS CONTROL VALVE | [2012/18] | French: | VANNE DE COMMANDE D'ÉMISSIONS D'UN PETIT MOTEUR | [2017/34] |
Former [2012/18] | VANNE DE COMMANDE D ÉMISSIONS D UN PETIT MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2010 | AL | 17.01.2018 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | GB | 22.06.2018 | IE | 22.06.2018 | LU | 22.06.2018 | MT | 22.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.06.2010 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
MT | 22.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
MT | 22.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
MT | 22.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 22.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
IE | 22.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9109221 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* page 13, line 6 - page 17, line 17; figures 5-10 *; | [XYI]US2002112701 (GRACYALNY GARY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,5-7,11 * [Y] 3,4,9,10,13-15 [I] 5-8,12; | [A]US2002144730 (BROCK MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007023016 (MILLS VAUGHN K [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * |