EP2593294 - COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Learjet Inc. One Learjet Way Wichita, KS 67209 / US | For:MT
SHORT BROTHERS PLC Airport Road Belfast BT3 9DZ / GB | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLE, Luca 7036 blvd. St-Laurent app. 221 Montréal Québec H2S 3E2 / CA | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | den Braber, Gérard Paul PROXIP Tour CIT, bureau 918 3, rue de l'Arrivée 75749 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | den Braber, Gerard Paul PROXIP 3 Rue de l'Arrivée 75749 Paris cedex 15 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10742575.3 | 13.07.2010 | WO2010IB01728 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012007780 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593294 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/30, B29D99/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29C70/30 (EP,US);
B29D99/0014 (EP,US);
B32B3/08 (US);
B32B37/22 (US);
B29K2105/246 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/21] | English: | COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME | [2013/21] | French: | STRUCTURE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE CETTE STRUCTURE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 16.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.02.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2013 | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.2013 | 31.07.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1317779 (GILL M C) [A] 1-19 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 34 ** figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [Y]EP0287103 (BOEING CO) [Y] 1-6,14,16,17 * column 6, line 12 - line 24 * * figure 8 *; | [Y]US4786343 (HERTZBERG PAUL E [US]) [Y] 1-6,14 * figure 1 * * column 4 *; | [Y]US5817269 (YOUNIE MARK L [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,16-18 * figures 1,2,3,8,9,10,11,12,14 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 17 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 62 *; | [XYI]DE19845863 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 14,16,17 * column 5, line 62 - line 67 * * figure 9 * [Y] 15,18 [I] 19; | [Y]US2007175171 (DELGADO JULIO N [ES], et al) [Y] 1-13,15-17 * figures 2,3,7a,7b,7c * * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] - [0029] - [0038] *; | [XYI]US2007277470 (VICHNIAKOV ALEXEI [DE]) [X] 14,15 * figures 1b,2,6,11 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] , [0054] , [0055] , [0056] , [0058] * [Y] 16-18 [I] 19; | [Y]US2008265093 (MUNOZ LOPEZ MARIA PILAR [ES], et al) [Y] 1-6,14,16,17 * figures 4,9,10,11,13 * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0056] - [0062] * | by applicant | US4966802 | US5170967 | US5242523 | US5593633 | US5817269 | US5847930 | WO9939976 | DE19845863 | WO0115868 | EP1151856 | US6375121 | US6391246 | US6508909 | US6565351 | US6589472 | EP1336469 | US6730184 | US6743504 | US6802931 | WO2006118691 | WO2006136560 | WO2006138025 | US2007175171 | US2007277470 | US2007293110 | DE102006031334 | WO2008003715 | WO2008003767 | EP1888323 | EP2038099 | EP2038107 | US7527222 | WO2009111466 | WO2009112694 | WO2009132892 |