EP2464682 - VINYL CHLORIDE POLYMER FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner Pentaplast GmbH Industriestr. 3-5 56412 Heiligenroth / DE | [2013/30] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Klöckner Pentaplast GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 3-5 56412 Heiligenroth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEIRINGER, Günther Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 48 84556 Kastl / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Bernd Halfterweg 7 56412 Gackenbach / DE | 03 /
JÜRGENS, Sascha Rathausstrasse 3A 65558 Eppenrod / DE | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Plate, Jürgen, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Plate, Jürgen, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10742755.1 | 04.08.2010 | WO2010EP04779 | Priority number, date | DE20091037253 | 12.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009037253 | [2012/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011018182 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464682 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464682 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L27/06 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J2327/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLIE AUS VINYLCHLORIDPOLYMERISAT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2012/25] | English: | VINYL CHLORIDE POLYMER FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2012/25] | French: | FEUILLE DE POLYMÉRISAT DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3686361 (WITT WALTER GROESBECK DE, et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4206291 (HOPKINS GEORGE C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 10, line 41 - column 10, line 49; examples 6,19-24; claim 1 * [A] 2-18; | [A]EP0545306 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03018686 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]WO2006079363 (KLOECKNER PENTAPLAST GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | Examination | DE102005003776 | by applicant | EP1066339 |