EP2460053 - SOLID STATE SHUTTER DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHURBOFF, Carl, L. 1778 Fairport Drive Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | 02 /
HE, Fan 5523 Notting Hill Road Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10742934.2 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US42692 | Priority number, date | US20090512408 | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 512408 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011014390 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460053 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/08 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G03B9/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/71 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US);
H04N23/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/23] | English: | SOLID STATE SHUTTER DEVICES AND METHODS | [2012/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'OBTURATEUR À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 20.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 10.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4526454 (SUZUKI RYOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO9940478 (3DV SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US6437925 (NISHIOKA KIMIHIKO [JP]); | [A]US2007121072 (MISAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) |