EP2442902 - MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING ELEMENTS BETWEEN LIQUID PHASES AND USE OF SAID SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING SAID ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING ELEMENTS BETWEEN LIQUID PHASES AND USE OF SAID SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING SAID ELEMENTS. | ||
[2019/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTHIER, Jean 8 Les Florentines F-38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
LE VOT, Sophie 2B Lotissement La Colinière F-38760 Varces / FR | 03 /
RIVERA, Florence 70 rue Anatole France F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/17] | 01 /
BERTHIER, Jean 8 Les Florentines F-38240 Meylan / FR | ||
02 /
LE VOT, Sophie 24 rue de Stalingrad F-38800 Le Pont De Claix / FR | |||
03 /
RIVERA, Florence 51B rue des Aiguinards F-38240 Meylan / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/17] | Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10743195.9 | 18.06.2010 | [2019/38] | WO2010FR00453 | Priority number, date | FR20090002988 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0902988 | [2012/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010146261 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442902 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2442902 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B01F13/00, B01L3/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01F33/3011 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | B01J19/00, B01F13/00, B01L3/00, B01D61/24, B01D11/04, B81B3/00, C12M3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ELEMENTEN ZWISCHEN FLÜSSIGPHASEN UND VERWENDUNG DIESES SYSTEMS ZUR EXTRAKTION DIESER ELEMENTE | [2019/16] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING ELEMENTS BETWEEN LIQUID PHASES AND USE OF SAID SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING SAID ELEMENTS | [2019/16] | French: | SYSTEME MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ELEMENTS ENTRE PHASES LIQUIDES ET UTILISATION DE CE SYSTEME POUR EXTRAIRE CES ELEMENTS | [2019/16] |
Former [2012/17] | MIKROFLUIDISCHES SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ELEMENTEN ZWISCHEN FLÜSSIGPHASEN UND VERWENDUNG DIESES SYSTEMS ZUR EXTRAKTION DIESER ELEMENTE | ||
Former [2012/17] | MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING ELEMENTS BETWEEN LIQUID PHASES AND USE OF SAID SYSTEM FOR EXTRACTING SAID ELEMENTS. | ||
Former [2012/17] | SYSTEME MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ELEMENTS ENTRE PHASES LIQUIDES ET UTILISATION DE CE SYSTEME POUR EXTRAIRE CES ELEMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2010 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | IE | 18.06.2020 | LU | 18.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 18.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002175079 (CHRISTEL LEE A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003159999 (OAKEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0 62] - [0079] * * figures 5-5c, 6,9a-9f, 10-13 *; | [X]US2003226806 (YOUNG LINCOLN C [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0034] , [0035] , [0039] - [0049] * * figures 1,3-6,8-11 *; | [X]US2004028580 (FUTAMI TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0029] - [0032] - [0068] , [0070] - [0075] - [0081] , [0082] , [0086] - [0089] - [0152] * * figures 2,6b,8a-8d,12a-12d,21a,21b *; | [A]US2006035386 (HATTORI WATARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007059719 (GRISHAM MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0060] - [0094] * * figures 2-4,11a-11e,18a-18d * * table 1 *; | [XP]EP2119503 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [XP] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0024] - [0036] - [0059] - [62;64] - [0076] * * figures 1-12,17a-17c *; | FR2931141 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | by applicant | EP0787029 | WO2004037374 | US2007026381 | US2007059781 | - D. W. INGLIS; J. A. DAVIS; R. H. AUSTIN; J. C. STURM, "Critical particle size for fractionation by deterministic lateral displacement", LAB CHIP, (2006), vol. 6, pages 655 - 658 | - K. LIU; H. J. DING; Y. CHEN; X.Z. ZHAO, "Droplet-based synthetic method using microflow focusing and droplet fusion", MICROFLUID. NANOFLUID, (2007), vol. 3, pages 239 - 243 | - V. L. WORKMAN; S. B. DUNNETT; P. KILLE; D. D. PALMER, "On-chip alginate microencapsulation of functional cells", MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, (2008), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 165 - 170 |