EP2400791 - METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING ACCESS AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 19.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yixian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
BI, Xiaoyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10743425.0 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010CN70711 | Priority number, date | CN20091037343 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: CN200910037343 | [2011/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010094244 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400791 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/06, // H04W84/04, H04W84/12, H04W88/06 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/162 (EP);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP);
H04W84/042 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W88/06 | ||
Former IPC [2011/52] | H04W12/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR ZUGANGSAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2011/52] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING ACCESS AUTHENTICATION | [2011/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME POUR RÉALISER UNE AUTHENTIFICATION D'ACCÈS | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2011 | Translation filed | 22.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/47] | 17.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.01.2019 | 11.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005055633 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,9,18 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 2 *; | [XI]US2008034207 (CAM-WINGET NANCY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13,15-17 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figure 4 * [I] 4-9,14,18; | [XI] - ABOBA B ET AL, "RADIUS (Remote Authentication Dial In User Service) Support For Extensible Authentication Protocol (EAP); RFC 3579", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, (200309), XP015009361 [X] 1-3,10-13,15-17 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 15 * * page 26, line 12 - page 27, line 36 * * page 37 * [I] 4-9,14,18 | [A] - "Architecture Enhancements for non-3GPP accesses (Release 8)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP) TS 23.402, (200709), XP050363682 [A] 1-18 * section 5.4 * | International search | [X]EP1414212 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [Y]CN1835436 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101141822 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [X]CN101232707 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN101472263 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |