EP2399397 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2020/09] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Haike c/o RICOH COMPANY LIMITED 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
LI, Tao c/o RICOH SOFTWARE RESEARCH CENTER ( Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No.168 Xiwai Street, Haidian District Beijing 100044 / CN | 03 /
YUAN, Xun c/o RICOH SOFTWARE RESEARCH CENTER (Beijing) Co. Ltd. Tengda Plaza 28th Floor No.168 Xiwai Street, Haidian District Beijing 100044 / CN | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10743617.2 | 19.01.2010 | [2020/15] | WO2010JP50868 | Priority number, date | JP20090037999 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009037999 | JP20090059699 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009059699 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095488 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399397 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2399397 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/73, G06T1/00, H04N1/46, H04N1/60, H04N9/04 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G06T5/94 (EP,US);
H04N23/88 (EP,US);
H04N1/6027 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/71 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2011/52] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2011/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, APPAREIL DE PRISE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MK | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002131635 (COOPER TED J [US]) [A] 5-7 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0084] *; | [X]US2003016881 (MATSUURA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0130] *; | [A]US2005069201 (SPEIGLE JON M [US], et al) [A] 5-7 * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0152] *; | [A]JP2007129622 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [A] 1,10,15* paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] *; | [X]EP1887521 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0044] *; | [XI]JP2008052428 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,2,4,8-11,14,15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0078] * [I] 3,5-7,12,13 | International search | [Y]JP2559000B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO.,LTD.); | [Y]JP2002281512 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003061103 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003163944 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2008052428 (NIKON CORP) | by applicant | JP2000224608 | JP2004064468 | JP3849834B |