EP2399671 - COPPER-BASED CATALYST MANUFACTURING METHOD AND PRETREATMENT METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/52] | COPPER-BASED CATALYST MANUFACTURING METHOD, COPPER-BASED CATALYST, AND PRETREATMENT METHOD FOR SAME | ||
[2016/28] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Masami c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Ken c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, Yuya c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2011/52] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Masami c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEDA, Ken c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
GOTO, Yuya c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS INC. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10743725.3 | 15.02.2010 | [2016/52] | WO2010JP52211 | Priority number, date | JP20090040055 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009040055 | JP20090040056 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009040056 | JP20090040057 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009040057 | [2011/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095599 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399671 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2399671 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/06, B01J23/80, B01J37/00, B01J37/03, C07C29/154, C07C31/04, C07B61/00 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C07C29/154 (EP,US);
B01J23/80 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/08 (KR);
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
C07C31/04 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/154, C07C31/04 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/48 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS AUF KUPFERBASIS UND VORBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/28] | English: | COPPER-BASED CATALYST MANUFACTURING METHOD AND PRETREATMENT METHOD FOR SAME | [2016/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATALYSEUR À BASE DE CUIVRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉTRAITEMENT DE CELUI-CI | [2016/28] |
Former [2011/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS AUF KUPFERBASIS, KATALYSATOR AUF KUPFERBASIS UND VORBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/52] | COPPER-BASED CATALYST MANUFACTURING METHOD, COPPER-BASED CATALYST, AND PRETREATMENT METHOD FOR SAME | ||
Former [2011/52] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATALYSEUR À BASE DE CUIVRE, CATALYSEUR À BASE DE CUIVRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉTRAITEMENT DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | Translation filed | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 10.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Ridland, John Johnson Matthey Catalysts Intellectual Property Dept. PO Box 1 Belasis Avenue, Billingham Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | [2017/44] | 08.11.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/40] | 27.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.05.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | IE | 15.02.2017 | LU | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.02.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0864360 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [XD] 1-15* example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JPS60190232 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) | by applicant | JPS5276288 | JPS6339287 | JPH06254414 | JPH06312138 | JPH078799 | JPH0739755 | JPH10309466 | JP2004298685 | JP2007083197 | - Shokubai Koza, KODANSHA LTD., (19890720), vol. 7, pages 21 - 39 | - APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (1996), vol. 38, pages 311 - 318 | - Shokubai Koza, KODANSHA LTD., (19890720), vol. 7 | Opposition | GB1296212 | GB1405012 | US4788175 | US6048820 | WO2008047166 | - "Filtration, Pressure Systems", John J. McKetta et al, Encyclopedia of Chemical Processing and Design, (19840000), pages 389 - 392, ISBN 0824724518, XP055422673 | - T. J. VAN GASSEL et al., "Crossflow Microfiltration in the Process Industry", Desalination, (19850000), vol. 53, pages 373 - 387, XP055422675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0011-9164(85)85074-8 |