EP2400819 - POWER-SAVING LED LIGHTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luminature Co., Ltd. 311ho, GSBC Venture Incubator Bldg. 906-5, Iui-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-766 / KR | For all designated states Kim, Jin Sook 229dong, 901ho Sungwon Santevill 3-cha 866 Sanghyeon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-519 / KR | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Dae Young 101ho, 708-4 I-dong Sangnok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 426-863 / KR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 10743888.9 | 08.01.2010 | WO2010KR00114 | Priority number, date | KR20090013056 | 17.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090013056 | KR20090028436 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090028436 | [2011/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010095813 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2400819 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B33/08 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
H05B45/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPARENDE LED-BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/52] | English: | POWER-SAVING LED LIGHTING APPARATUS | [2011/52] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE LED BASSE CONSOMMATION | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2011 | Translation filed | 31.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 14.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2012 | 31.01.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007257623 (JOHNSON BRANT T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018]; figure 6 *; | [X]WO2008034242 (TIR TECHNOLOGY LP [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figure 4 * | International search | [A]JP2008059811 (AVAGO TECH ECBU IP SG PTE LTD); | [A]KR100453133B (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [A]KR200405272Y (KODISS CO., LTD. ET AL.); | [A]JP2005142137 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]KR20010093337 (TAKION CO., LTD.) |