EP2398450 - AQUEOUS NANOEMULSION COMPOSITION CONTAINING CONJUGATED LINOLEIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hwail Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Hwail Building 776-12 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-928 / KR | For all designated states Yu, Hyo Gyoung 1903-105 Gangsun-maeul Juyeop-dong Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 411-746 / KR | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Hyo Gyoung 1903-105 Gangsun-maeul Juyeop-dong Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-city Gyeonggi-do 411-746 / KR | 02 /
JI, Hong Geun Cheonggu Apt. 1620-801 Sarang-maeul Sang-dong Wonmi-gu Bucheon-city Gyeonggi-do 420-709 / KR | 03 /
WOO, Hye Kyeong 1211 Hansin Core Apt. 11-9 Sincheon-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-240 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Soo Dong Samsung Raemian Apt. 104-1202 Singil 4-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-054 / KR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Rands, Peter David, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10743952.3 | 19.02.2010 | WO2010KR01029 | Priority number, date | KR20090014347 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090014347 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010095877 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398450 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398450 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/55, A61K8/63, A23D7/005, A23D7/01, A23L1/30, A61K8/36, A61Q19/06, A61K8/86 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/55 (KR);
A23D7/0053 (EP,US);
A23D7/011 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/553 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (KR);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61Q1/00 (KR);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1866, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/082, A23V2250/6406, A23V2200/244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | A23D7/005, A23D7/01, A23L1/30, A23L1/48, A61K8/36, A61Q19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61K8/36, A61Q19/00, A23L2/38, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE NANOEMULSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONJUGIERTER LINOLSÄURE | [2011/52] | English: | AQUEOUS NANOEMULSION COMPOSITION CONTAINING CONJUGATED LINOLEIC ACID | [2011/52] | French: | COMPOSITION DE NANOÉMULSION AQUEUSE CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE LINOLÉIQUE CONJUGUÉ | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 25.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2010 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | SM | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
SM | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006057187 (ESKUCHEN RAINER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009005215 (HWAIL PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 1 - page 6 * * claims 1-11 * | [A] - SOLANS C ET AL, "Nano-emulsions", CURRENT OPINION IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, vol. 10, no. 3-4, ISSN 1359-0294, (20051001), pages 102 - 110, (20051001), XP027721299 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2006057187 (ESKUCHEN RAINER [DE], et al); | [A]JP2007282574 (HASEGAWA T CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2002265374 (TAIYO KAGAKU KK); | [A]WO9718320 (LODERS CROKLAAN BV [NL], et al) |