EP2398549 - BALLOON CATHETER INFLATION APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entellus Medical, Inc. 6705 Wedgwood Ct. North Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESCH, JR., Paul R. 7944 Joseph Court Lino Lakes Minnesota 55014 / US | 02 /
VAJGRT, Paul A. 3279 Kahlen Avenue NE Saint Michael Minnesota 55376 / US | 03 /
PETRICK, Timothy B. 9006 Trinity Gardens Brooklyn Park Minnesota 55443 / US | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Lecomte, Didier, et al Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 10744139.6 | 08.02.2010 | WO2010US23479 | Priority number, date | US20090372691 | 17.02.2009 Original published format: US 372691 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096294 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398549 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, A61M39/22 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/10182 (EP,US);
A61B17/24 (EP,US);
A61M25/1018 (US);
A61M25/10185 (EP,US);
A61M25/10187 (US);
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61M39/12 (US);
A61M39/22 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1033 (US);
A61M2210/0618 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSBLASEN EINES BALLONKATHETERS | [2011/52] | English: | BALLOON CATHETER INFLATION APPARATUS AND METHODS | [2011/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE GONFLEMENT DE CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 05.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5085249 (DRAGAN WILLIAM B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9533510 (WILLIS ALLAN [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3A-3C ** page 3, line 24 - page 10, line 21 *; | [A]WO9744077 (MERIT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US5993416 (CHOH RICHARD T [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,14 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 15 * * column 4, line 4 - column 4, line 12 * * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 20 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 52 * [I] 2-7,11-13; | [XI]EP0988870 (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10,14 * figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * [I] 6,7,11-13 | International search | [Y]US5997512 (SHAW THOMAS J [US]); | [X]US6050973 (DUFFY NIALL F [IE]); | [Y]US2004098017 (SAAB MARK A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008172033 (KEITH PETER T [US], et al) |