EP2467411 - COPOLYESTER POLYOLS, PREPOLYMERS, AND POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS FORMED THEREFROM AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Solutions US Inc. 199 Benson Road Middlebury, Connecticut 06762 / US | [2018/20] |
Former [2014/38] | For all designated states Chemtura Corporation 199 Benson Road Middlebury, CT 06749 / US | ||
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Chemtura Corporation 199 Benson Road Middlebury, CT 06749 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Biau-Hung 3 Aberdeen Place Basking Ridge NJ 07920 / US | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2014/38] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/32] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle sas Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10745053.8 | 04.08.2010 | [2018/34] | WO2010US44363 | Priority number, date | US20100806019 | 04.08.2010 Original published format: US 806019 | US20090235786P | 21.08.2009 Original published format: US 235786 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011022205 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467411 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467411 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2467411 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/42, C08G18/63, C08G63/08 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0895 (KR);
C08G18/42 (KR);
C08G18/4252 (KR);
C08G18/4277 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4286 (EP,US);
C08G18/63 (KR);
C08G18/631 (EP,US);
C08G63/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | COPOLYESTERPOLYOLE, PREPOLYMERE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE POLYURETHANELASTOMERE SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/26] | English: | COPOLYESTER POLYOLS, PREPOLYMERS, AND POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS FORMED THEREFROM AND PROCESSES FOR MAKING SAME | [2012/26] | French: | COPOLYESTER POLYOLS, PRÉPOLYMÈRES ET ÉLASTOMÈRES POLYURÉTHANES FORMÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
19.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | 02
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
19.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
02
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | |||
Former [2016/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
19.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstraße 3 80333 München / DE | ||
02
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Michael Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | |||
Former [2015/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
19.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstraße 3 80333 München / DE | ||
02
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Michael Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | |||
Former [2015/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
19.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstraße 3 80333 München / DE | ||
02
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Michael Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | |||
Former [2015/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.2015
Strawman Limited 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Margue, Robert Germain Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstraße 3 80333 München / DE | ||
02
17.06.2015
Bayer MaterialScience AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 22.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.11.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.06.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2010 | AL | 17.09.2014 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BE | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | IE | 04.08.2015 | LU | 04.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MK | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003144454 (KREBS MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10,12,14,16 * paragraph [0002]; examples 1,2 * [I] 3-6,8,9,11,13,15,17; | [XI]GB1262383 (INTER POLYMER RES CORP [US]) [X] 3-5,7,11,12,15 * page 11, lines 69-89; examples 12,17 * [I] 1,2,6,8-10,13,14,16,17; | [A]DE2344707 (SCHERING AG) [A] 1-17 * pages 8-9; claim 1 * | by applicant | US5804114 | US5874172 | US6150025 |