EP2467588 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UTILIZING BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVANOVIC, Dragan Knorr-von-Rosenroth-Straße 44 92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 02 /
JOHANNSSEN, Sven Jannerstraße 6 93053 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
PRITSCHER, Reinhard Roider-Jackl-Weg 17 84030 Ergolding / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10745200.5 | 12.08.2010 | WO2010EP61753 | Priority number, date | DE20091038323 | 21.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009038323 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020767 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467588 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02C1/04, F02C3/28, F02C6/18, C10J3/02, C10J3/20, F01K23/06 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
F02C3/28 (EP,US);
F01K23/067 (EP,US);
F02C1/04 (EP,US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0916 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0956 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0976 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1606 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1671 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1869 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1892 (EP,US);
C10J3/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWERTUNG VON BIOMASSSE | [2012/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UTILIZING BIOMASS | [2012/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VALORISATION DE LA BIOMASSE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 12.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3931582 (KRANTZ GMBH ENERGIEPLANUNG H [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 58 - column 6, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5069685 (BISSETT LARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, lines 32-67; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9324704 (CHEMREC AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * page 7, paragraphs 1-3; figure 1 * * page 12, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 13, paragraphs 1-3 *; | [A]DE4342165 (UMWELT & ENERGIETECH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US6032456 (EASOM BRUCE H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 21; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE10039246 (ATZ EVUS [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] - [0032]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2003106266 (BRYAN BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE202004017725U (FRANKE BERNDT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y] - MARKUS ISING, "Vergasung fester Biomasse - Bereits Stand der Technik?", GÜLZOWER FACHGESPRÄCH. ENERGETISCHE NUTZUNG VON BIOMASSE DURCH KRAFT-WÄRME-KOPPLUNG: STAND DER TECHNIK UND PERSPEKTIVEN FÜR DEN LÄNDLICHEN RAUM, GÜLZOW, 16.-17. MAI 2000,, (20000516), pages 1 - 19, XP007915297 [Y] 4 * paragraph [04.2]; figures 4,6 * | by applicant | EP0620909 | DE4236619 | DE19836428 | DE10039246 | DE10227074 |