EP2470507 - N-Alkoxycarboxamides and their use as microbiocides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/27] | N-ALKOXYCARBOXAMIDES AND THEIR USE AS MICROBIOCIDES | ||
[2014/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Harald Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | 02 /
RAJAN, Ramya Syngenta Biosciences Private Limites Santa Monica Works Corlim Ilhas Goa Goa 403 110 / IN | 03 /
STIERLI, Daniel Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse CH-4332 Stein / CH | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Syngenta International AG WRO 1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldalle 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2012/27] | Hölscher, Ingo Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | Application number, filing date | 10745243.5 | 23.08.2010 | WO2010EP62206 | Priority number, date | IN2009DEL1760 | 25.08.2009 Original published format: IN DE17602009 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023645 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470507 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470507 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/14, C07D231/16, A01N43/56, C07C239/10, C07C239/20 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
C07D231/14 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
C07C239/10 (EP,US);
C07C239/20 (EP,US);
C07D231/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-Alkylcarboxamide und ihre Verwendung als Microbiozide | [2014/04] | English: | N-Alkoxycarboxamides and their use as microbiocides | [2014/04] | French: | N-Alkylcarboxamides et leur utilisation comme microbiocides | [2014/04] |
Former [2012/27] | N-ALKOXYCARBOXAMIDE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MIKROBIOZIDE | ||
Former [2012/27] | N-ALKOXYCARBOXAMIDES AND THEIR USE AS MICROBIOCIDES | ||
Former [2012/27] | N-ALCOXYCARBOXAMIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MICROBIOCIDES | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2010 | AL | 26.03.2014 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | IE | 23.08.2014 | LU | 23.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MK | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.08.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3415138 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 7 * claims 1,4,5-8 * * page 7, formula (VI); page 10, compounds 41 and 42 * [Y] 1-6,8,9; | [A]WO0109104 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1* examples 1.9,1.28,1.63-1.65,1.84,; claims 1,5-7 *; | [A]DE10239905 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * claims 1,18,21 * * page 7, formula (III) *; | [YD]WO2007087906 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE SA [FR], et al) [YD] 1-6,8,9 * page 25, line 30 - page 44, line 2; claims 1,11,15 *; | [A]WO2008148570 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * examples P1-P3; claims 1,13-15 *; | [YD]WO2009024342 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-6,8,9 * example P1; claims 1,3,9,10 * | by applicant | EP0353191 | EP0392225 | WO9533818 | WO9733890 | WO2007087906 | WO2009024342 |