EP2448404 - DEVICE FOR MAKING AN AREA OFF-LIMITS TO A PET, AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynavet Rue Chappe 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOULIN, Jean 137 Rue Chateaubriand F-63000 Clermont Ferrand / FR | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 10745339.1 | 25.06.2010 | WO2010FR51321 | Priority number, date | FR20090003248 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0903248 | [2012/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011001083 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448404 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01K15/02 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A01K15/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FÜR EIN HAUSTIER UNZUGÄNGLICHEN BEREICHS UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2012/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR MAKING AN AREA OFF-LIMITS TO A PET, AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH A DEVICE | [2012/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERDICTION D'UNE ZONE À UN ANIMAL DOMESTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 25.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2001042522 (BARRY JAMES R [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0034] - [0044] - [0090] - [0100]; figures 1-3,15,16 *; | [A]US2005035865 (BRENNAN EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5353744 (CUSTER DANIEL A [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 38 * * column 14, lines 10-26; figures 1A,1B * | by applicant | WO0075046 | WO2004014129 | US5872516 | US2001042522 |