EP2470740 - Electromagnetically sealed door for a measurement chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/27] | ELECTROMAGNETICALLY SEALED DOOR FOR A MEASUREMENT CHAMBER | ||
[2015/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMER, Andreas Eichenfeld 3 94104 Tittling / DE | 02 /
BARTSCH, Alexander Sankt-Härmann-Platz 9a 94518 Spiegelau / DE | 03 /
MUHR, Hermann Grub 9 94267 Prackenbach / DE | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10745560.2 | 16.08.2010 | [2015/41] | WO2010EP05024 | Priority number, date | DE20091038916 | 26.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009038916 | [2012/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023314 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470740 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470740 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E06B5/18, H05K9/00, E05D15/10, E05D15/56 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
E06B5/18 (EP,US);
E05D15/58 (US);
E05D3/06 (US);
E05D3/18 (US);
E05F11/145 (US);
E06B3/50 (US);
E06B3/5054 (US);
E06B3/509 (US);
H05K9/0016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisch dichte Tür für eine Messkammer | [2015/20] | English: | Electromagnetically sealed door for a measurement chamber | [2015/20] | French: | Porte à étanchéité électromagnétique pour une chambre de mesure | [2015/20] |
Former [2012/27] | ELEKTROMAGNETISCH DICHTE TÜR FÜR EINE MESSKAMMER | ||
Former [2012/27] | ELECTROMAGNETICALLY SEALED DOOR FOR A MEASUREMENT CHAMBER | ||
Former [2012/27] | PORTE À ÉTANCHÉITÉ ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE MESURE | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 24.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2010 | AL | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | IT | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | NL | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0379898 (KUNZ ALFRED & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 7 - column 9; figures 13-14a * [Y] 6,13,14; | [XY]US4561209 (SOHLSTROEM LASSE [FI]) [X] 1-3,11,12 * column 3 - column 5; figure 1 * [Y] 6,13,14; | [XYI]DE3916836 (ABS ALLGEMEINER BRANDSCHUTZ) [X] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-2a * [Y] 13,14 [I] 7-10; | [XY]EP0720422 (EUROSHIELD OY [FI]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 6; | [Y]US3531577 (GARLINGTON FRANK E) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0512406 (NUKEM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 13,14 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2004090270 (BOFFI S P A [IT], et al) [Y] 13,14 * figures 4-6c *; | [A]DE3204274 (WINKLER & CIE AG ELEKTRO [CH]) [A] 10 * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE3919184 |