EP2402406 - OUTSTANDINGLY ABRASION RESISTANT AND POLLUTION RESISTANT COATING COMPOSITION AND COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Yeong-Rae 504-1901 Banseok Maeul 5-danji Apt. Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-750 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Joon-Koo 201-815, Jugong Apt. Wolpyeong 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-793 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Kyung-Ki 904-206 Ssangyong Sweet.(dot) Home Ochangyega 647-1, Gak-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Soon-Hwa 106-1305, Hanbit Apt. Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Hye-Min 1703, Magnolia 939, Dunsan 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-828 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Soo-Kyoung 258 Odong-dong Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-567 / KR | 07 /
YOO, Eun-Sang 202, 405-14 Guryong-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | 08 /
KIM, Sung-Su 115-1802, Woolim FILLU 1-cha Apt. Gak-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | 09 /
HONG, Young-Jun c/o LG Chem, Ltd. Research Park 104-1, Moonji-dong Duseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Ju-Young 605-1203 Hanwha Woolim Apt. Bansong-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do, 445-755 / KR | [2012/04] |
Former [2012/01] | 01 /
CHANG, Yeong-Rae 504-1901 Banseok Maeul 5-danji Apt. Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-750 / KR | ||
02 /
KANG, Joon-Koo 201-815, Jugong Apt. Wolpyeong 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-793 / KR | |||
03 /
HONG, Kyung-Ki 904-206 Ssangyong Sweet.(dot) Home Ochangyega 647-1, Gak-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | |||
04 /
JUNG, Soon-Hwa 106-1305, Hanbit Apt. Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Hye-Min 1703, Magnolia 939, Dunsan 2-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-828 / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Soo-Kyoung 258 Odong-dong Sangdang-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 360-567 / KR | |||
07 /
YOO, Eun-Sang 202, 405-14 Guryong-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | |||
08 /
KIM, Sung-Su 115-1802, Woolim FILLU 1-cha Apt. Gak-ri Ochang-eup Cheongwon-gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-883 / KR | |||
09 /
HONG, Young-Jun c/o LG Chem, Ltd. Research Park 104-1, Moonji-dong Duseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | |||
10 /
KIM, Ju-Young 107-1704 Sunbi Maeul 440-4, Beob-dong Daedeok-gu Daejeon 306-060 / KR | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10746475.2 | 26.02.2010 | WO2010KR01261 | Priority number, date | KR20090017229 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090017229 | KR20100017432 | 26.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100017432 | [2012/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010098636 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402406 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2402406 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/06, C09D127/12, C09D5/00, C09D7/12, G02F1/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C09D5/1612 (EP,US);
C08F222/106 (EP,US);
C09D133/14 (EP,US);
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,US);
C09K2323/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F222/106, C08F220/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON AUSSERORDENTLICH HOHER ABRIEB- UND VERSCHMUTZUNGSFESTIGKEIT SOWIE BESCHICHTUNGSFILM DARAUS | [2012/01] | English: | OUTSTANDINGLY ABRASION RESISTANT AND POLLUTION RESISTANT COATING COMPOSITION AND COATING FILM | [2012/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT EXCEPTIONNELLEMENT RÉSISTANTE À L'ABRASION ET À LA POLLUTION ET FILM DE REVÊTEMENT L'UTILISANT | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2011 | Translation filed | 18.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 12.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005158504 (ITOH HIDETAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0062] ** example 1; claims 1-12,14-18,21-23 *; | [X]JP2005266051 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2009069974 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [XP] 1-23 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 6 * * examples 1-7; claims 1-5,7,10,12-18 * | International search | [X]JP2005179613 (TDK CORP); | [Y]KR20060030784 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [Y]KR20060031941 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]); | [A]KR20080005722 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20080005723 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [XP]KR20090056913 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20090017229 | KR20100017432 |