EP2401367 - HYPERACTIVE PIGGYBAC TRANSPOSASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poseida Therapeutics, Inc. 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2017/18] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Transposagen Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 201 West Second Street Lexington, KY 40507 / US | ||
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Transposagen Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 201 West Second Street Lexington, KY 40507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERTAG, Eric 2824 Belle Haven Pl. Lexington, KY 40511 / US | 02 /
MADISON, Blair 2208 Delancey Pl. Apt. 1G Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | ||
Former [2012/01] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10746822.5 | 25.02.2010 | [2016/48] | WO2010US25380 | Priority number, date | US20090155804P | 26.02.2009 Original published format: US 155804 P | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010099296 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401367 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401367 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C12N9/1241 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (US);
A61D19/04 (US);
A61K48/0008 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Y207/07 (EP,US);
A01K2217/052 (US);
A01K2227/00 (US);
A01K67/0333 (US);
C12N15/907 (US);
C12N2799/027 (EP,US);
C12N2800/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYPERAKTIVE PIGGYBAC-TRANSPOSASEN | [2012/01] | English: | HYPERACTIVE PIGGYBAC TRANSPOSASES | [2012/01] | French: | TRANSPOSASES PIGGYBAC HYPERACTIVES | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2015 | 08.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16200960.9 / EP3184632 | EP24167984.4 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | LU | 25.02.2017 | MT | 25.02.2017 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]FR2850395 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 2, line 6 - line 10 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 9 * * page 39, line 8 - line 28 *; | [I] - J. CADINANOS ET AL, "Generation of an inducible and optimized piggyBac transposon system", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20070606), vol. 35, no. 12, doi:10.1093/nar/gkm446, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1 - 8, XP055026860 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, column l * * page 3, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm446 | [I] - K. J. MARAGATHAVALLY, "Chimeric Mos1 and piggyBac transposases result in site-directed integration", THE FASEB JOURNAL, (20060901), vol. 20, no. 11, doi:10.1096/fj.05-5485fje, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 1880 - 1882, XP055035953 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page e1191, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * * figure 4 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.05-5485fje | [A] - S. C.-Y. WU ET AL, "From the Cover: piggyBac is a flexible and highly active transposon as compared to Sleeping Beauty, Tol2, and Mos1 in mammalian cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20061010), vol. 103, no. 41, doi:10.1073/pnas.0606979103, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15008 - 15013, XP055026853 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0606979103 | [T] - K. YUSA ET AL, "A hyperactive piggyBac transposase for mammalian applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110125), vol. 108, no. 4, doi:10.1073/pnas.1008322108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1531 - 1536, XP055035951 [T] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1532, column l, paragraph 2 - page 1533, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1008322108 | International search | [Y]US2007031967 (BIGOT YVES [FR], et al); | [Y]US2008279838 (MISKEY CSABA [DE], et al) | [Y] - UNIPROT, (20080722), Database accession no. Q27026 | [Y] - SARKAR ET AL., ""Molecular evolution analysis of the widespread piggyBac transposon family and related "domesticated" sequences"", MOL GEN GENOMICS, (20030829), vol. 270, pages 173 - 180 | by applicant | - METHODS ENZYMOL., (1984), vol. 101, page 414 | - HAMMER ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, page 680 | - GANDOLFIET, J. REPROD. FERT., (1987), vol. 81, pages 23 - 28 | - REXROAD ET AL., J. ANIM. SCI., (1988), vol. 66, pages 947 - 953 | - EYESTONE ET AL., J. REPROD. FERT., (1989), vol. 85, pages 715 - 720 | - CAMOUS ET AL., J. REPROD. FERT., (1984), vol. 72, pages 779 - 785 | - HEYMAN ET AL., THERIOGENOLOGY, (1987), vol. 27, page 5968 | - BRADLEY ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, pages 255 - 258 | - JAENISCH, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1468 - 1474 |