EP2401755 - TUNING FORK TERMINAL SLOW BLOW FUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Littelfuse, Inc. 8755 W. Higgins Road Suite 500 Chicago, IL 60631 / US | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Seibang 1655 Missouri Drive Elk Grove Village, IL 60007 / US | 02 /
URREA, Julio 3828 N. Lincoln, Unit 2 Chicago, IL 60613 / US | 03 /
BECKERT, James, J. 4500 Kirchoff Road Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | [2012/13] |
Former [2012/01] | 01 /
OH, Seibang 1655 Missouri Drive Elk Grove Village, IL 60007 / US | ||
02 /
URREA, Julio 3708 N. Wayne Apt. 2 Chicago, IL 60613 / US | |||
03 /
BECKERT, James, J. 4500 Kirchoff Road Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Kohl, Fabian Hanno, et al Hafner & Kohl Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10746823.3 | 25.02.2010 | [2018/23] | WO2010US25382 | Priority number, date | US20090155969P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 155969 P | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010099298 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401755 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401755 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/153, H01H85/147, H01H85/041 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H01H85/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H01H85/147 (EP,KR,US);
H01H85/153 (KR);
H01H85/0452 (US);
H01H85/143 (US);
H01H85/2035 (US);
H01H85/2045 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | H01H85/153 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGE SICHERUNG FÜR EINE EINSTELLGABELKLEMME | [2012/01] | English: | TUNING FORK TERMINAL SLOW BLOW FUSE | [2012/01] | French: | FUSIBLE À ACTION RETARDÉE DE BORNE À DIAPASON | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 26.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | GB | 25.02.2019 | IE | 25.02.2019 | LU | 25.02.2019 | MT | 25.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.02.2010 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
MT | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
MT | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6407657 (OH SEIBANG [US]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [Y] 2-12; | [X]US2008278276 (BANZO JUAN I [MX]) [X] 1 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US5886612 (BECKERT JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 2-9,11,12 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US4670729 (OH SEIBANG [US]) [Y] 2,10 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US6407657 (OH SEIBANG [US]); | [Y]US4670729 (OH SEIBANG [US]); | [A]US7479866 (GOLDSBERRY TIMOTHY R [US], et al); | [A]US5229739 (OH SEIBANG [US], et al); | [A]US5929740 (OH SEIBANG [US], et al) | Examination | JP2002118927 | by applicant | US2008278276 |