EP2486459 - Field bus interface and corresponding operating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/33] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD BUS INTERFACE | ||
[2014/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser Process Solutions AG Christoph-Merian-Ring 23 4153 Reinach / CH | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖLBLIN, Robert Haagener Straße 36 79539 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
MANEVAL, Michael Hans-Vetter-Strasse 64 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 03 /
PÖSCHMANN, Axel Florastrasse 11 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 04 /
REINKENSMEIER, Jörg Sägemattstrasse 24 79585 Steinen / DE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10747627.7 | 30.08.2010 | WO2010EP62612 | Priority number, date | DE20091045384 | 06.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009045384 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011042258 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2486459 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2486459 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02, H04L12/24, H04L12/403, H04L12/26, H04L12/40 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/4035 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40221 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
Y04S40/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/33] | G05B19/042, H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Feldbus-Interface und Verfahren zum Betreiben desselben | [2014/31] | English: | Field bus interface and corresponding operating method | [2014/31] | French: | Interface de bus de terrain et procédé de fonctionnement correspondant | [2014/31] |
Former [2012/33] | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FELDBUS-INTERFACE | ||
Former [2012/33] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIELD BUS INTERFACE | ||
Former [2012/33] | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INTERFACE DE BUS DE TERRAIN | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2010 | AL | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | IT | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.08.2010 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.08.2010 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102005063053 (ENDRESS & HAUSER PROCESS SOLUT [CH]) [AD] 1,8,10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19831405 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 38 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]US2005066104 (TRAIN ROBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0038]; figure 2 * | by applicant | WO2007074105 |